EP1787153 - TELECOMMUNICATIONS CABLE ENCLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Research & Development Corporation One Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2018/32] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, William G. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BALL, Shirley E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
BERGLUND, Sidney J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
MARKOS, Laszlo 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
PARIKH, Rutesh D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/13] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
ALLEN, William G. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
BALL, Shirley E. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
BERGLUND, Sidney J. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
MARKOS, Laszlo 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
05 /
PARIKH, Rutesh D. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2020/13] |
Former [2011/01] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | Hilleringmann, Jochen Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus am Dom) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 05764354.6 | 23.06.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005US22760 | Priority number, date | US20040916332 | 11.08.2004 Original published format: US 916332 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006023072 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787153 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1787153 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/117, G02B6/44, G02B6/38 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
G02B6/445 (EP,US);
G02B6/44528 (EP,KR);
H01L29/49 (US);
H01L29/51 (US);
H02G15/117 (EP,US);
G02B6/3897 (US)
|
Former IPC [2007/21] | G02B6/44, G02B6/36, G02B6/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | UMMANTELUNG FÜR TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSKABEL | [2007/21] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATIONS CABLE ENCLOSURE | [2007/21] | French: | GAINE DE CÂBLE DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2005 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | IT | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | NL | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | IE | 23.06.2020 | LU | 23.06.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | GB | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GB | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GB | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GB | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5042901 (MERRIKEN JAMES R [US], et al); | [Y]US5247135 (REBERS KENNETH D [US], et al); | [A]CH683646 (DIAMOND SA); | [XA]US5778122 (GIEBEL MARKUS A [US], et al); | [A]WO0231560 (NEPTEC OPTICAL SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al); | [A]US6385381 (JANUS NEAL ANTHONY [US], et al); | [X]US2003174996 (HENSCHEL JAMES J [US], et al); | [A]WO2004061511 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) |