EP1910109 - HORIZONTAL LOUVER SUPPORT BRACKET FOR AN EVAPORATOR UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation Carrier World Headquarters One Carrier Place, P.O.Box 4015 Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation Carrier World Headquarters One Carrier Place, P.O.Box 4015 Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORAES, Luciano, da Luz Rua Pinheiro Machado, 189, Bairro São José 92420-320 Canoas - RS / BR | 02 /
WALBER, Cristiano Rua Conc rdia, 360, Niter i 92120-140 Canoas - RS / BR | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Booth, Catherine Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Booth, Catherine Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05764551.7 | 29.07.2005 | [2008/16] | WO2005BR00154 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007012163 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910109 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/24, F24F1/00 | [2011/05] | CPC: |
F24F1/0011 (EP,KR);
F24F1/0047 (EP);
F24F1/005 (EP);
F24F1/0057 (EP,KR);
F24F13/14 (EP,KR);
F24F13/20 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2008/16] | B60H1/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | HORIZONTALE KLAPPENSTÜTZHALTERUNG FÜR EINE VERDAMPFEREINHEIT | [2008/16] | English: | HORIZONTAL LOUVER SUPPORT BRACKET FOR AN EVAPORATOR UNIT | [2008/16] | French: | SUPPORT A JALOUSIE HORIZONTALE POUR MODULE D EVAPORATION | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 26.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/16] | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05203254 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0886111 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US6210269 (TESCHE CARLOS ALFONSO [BR], et al) [A] 1-8* figures 1-9 *; | [Y]EP1321724 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * column 5 - column 7; figures 1-4 * | International search | [X]US6658882 (OHAMA YASUNORI [JP], et al); | [A]US6324859 (TESCHE CARLOS ALFONSO [BR], et al) | by applicant | EP1321724 | JPH05203254 |