EP1832087 - METHOD FOR REMOTELY CONTROLLING MEDIA DEVICES VIA A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. 4-12-3 Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2018/47] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Jesse, W. 1113 Capitata Crossing Apex, NC 27502 / US | 02 /
MADDHULA, Suri 508 Edgemore Avenue Cary, NC 27519 / US | 03 /
SCHOPPE, Don, W. 85 Goldfinch Lane Apex, NC 27523 / US | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Neusser, Sebastian, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2018/47] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05764585.5 | 11.07.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005US24405 | Priority number, date | US20040640583P | 31.12.2004 Original published format: US 640583 P | US20050114430 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: US 114430 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006073488 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832087 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1832087 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
H04L67/025 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/47] |
Former [2008/15] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FERNSTEUERUNG VON MEDIA-EINRICHTUNGEN ÜBER EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2007/37] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOTELY CONTROLLING MEDIA DEVICES VIA A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2007/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE A DISTANCE DE DISPOSITIFS MEDIAS PAR UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0147248 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,5-8,11-13,27-39 * page 2, lines 29-32 * * page 3, lines 4-7 * * page 5, lines 7-13 *[A] 2-4,9,10,14-26; | [X]US2002103898 (MOYER STANLEY L [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraphs [0326] - [0347] *; | [XA] - JOHANN REITTER, "Controlling and checking devices via the Session Initiation Protocol ÔÇô a service for the IM subsystem", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20030723), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013011420 [X] 1-26 * the whole document * [A] 27-39 |