EP1772031 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ESTABLISHING A MULTIMEDIA MESSAGE SERVICE OVER A WLAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAHEEN, Kamel, M. 429 Ashton Drive King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05764671.3 | 06.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005US23793 | Priority number, date | US20040592856P | 30.07.2004 Original published format: US 592856 P | US20050153207 | 15.06.2005 Original published format: US 153207 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006023108 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772031 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/12, // H04W60/00, H04W68/00 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
H04W68/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/02 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/16 (EP,US);
H04W88/184 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MULTIMEDIA-NACHRICHTENDIENSTES ÜBER EIN WLAN | [2007/15] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ESTABLISHING A MULTIMEDIA MESSAGE SERVICE OVER A WLAN | [2007/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL DESTINES A ETABLIR UN SERVICE DE MESSAGERIE MULTIMEDIA SUR UN RESEAU WLAN | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 08.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/35] | Divisional application(s) | EP13191849.2 / EP2701441 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003182431 (STURNIOLO EMIL [US], et al) [A] 1,6* the whole document *; | [A] - "3GPP TS 23.234 3rd Generation Partnership Project", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (2003), vol. 3-SA2, no. V230, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014031391 [A] 1,6 * page 19, paragraph 5.7.1 "Principles" * * page 70 - page 74; figure D.1 * | International search | [Y]WO9966746 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [Y]US2004039782 (REDDY GAUTAM G [US], et al); | [AP]WO2004099919 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al); | [AE]US6947738 (SKOG ROBERT [SE], et al) | Examination | WO02058356 |