EP1738011 - WASHING AND DRYING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2007/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Heung Gi Anam Plaza 517, Deokcheon 2-dong, Buk-gu Busan 616-754 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jae Mun 826-3 Gyeonghwa-dong Jinhae-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 645-800 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Kwang Soo 18-15 Sarim-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 641-824 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Myung Sik Sangnam Apt. 22-7, Sapa-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 641-826 / KR | 05 /
BYUN, Sang Tae 359, Kanglim-ri, Okpo-myeon Dalseong-gun, Daegu 711-842 / KR | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05764902.2 | 12.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005KR01040 | Priority number, date | KR20040026995 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: KR 2004026995 | KR20040026996 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: KR 2004026996 | KR20040026998 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: KR 2004026998 | KR20040026997 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: KR 2004026997 | KR20040026994 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: KR 2004026994 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005113879 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1738011 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1738011 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D06F25/00, D06F58/02 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
D06F37/262 (EP,US);
D06F25/00 (EP,US);
D06F37/04 (EP);
D06F37/264 (EP);
D06F37/266 (EP);
D06F37/267 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHTROCKNER | [2007/01] | English: | WASHING AND DRYING MACHINE | [2007/01] | French: | LAVE-LINGE SECHE-LINGE | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2009 | BE | 10.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2009 | CZ | 10.06.2009 | DK | 10.06.2009 | EE | 10.06.2009 | FI | 10.06.2009 | LT | 10.06.2009 | PL | 10.06.2009 | RO | 10.06.2009 | SI | 10.06.2009 | SK | 10.06.2009 | TR | 10.06.2009 | BG | 10.09.2009 | GR | 11.09.2009 | IS | 10.10.2009 | PT | 10.10.2009 | HU | 11.12.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CY | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
HU | 11.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CY | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4621438 (LANCIAUX FRANCIS [US]); | [X]JPH01249093 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]EP0595040 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT], et al); | [X]JP2000342881 (SHARP KK) |