EP1775483 - ANTI-LOOSENING SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUKUI BYORA CO. LTD 59-115, Yubinaka, Awara-shi Fukui 919-0898 / JP | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISE, Toshimitsu, c/o Fukui Byora Co., Ltd. 59-115, Yubinaka Awara-shi, Fukui 919-0898 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Hiroshi, c/o Fukui Byora Co., Ltd. 59-115, Yubinaka Awara-shi, Fukui 919-0898 / JP | 03 /
HASHIMOTO, Hirofumi, c/o Fukui Byora Co., Ltd. 59-115, Yubinaka Awara-shi, Fukui 919-0898 / JP | 04 /
NOZAKI, Yukio, c/o Fukui Byora Co., Ltd. 59-115, Yubinaka Awara-shi, Fukui 919-0898 / JP | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gottfried, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Müller, Gottfried, et al Wittner & Müller Patentanwälte Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05765252.1 | 04.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005JP12345 | Priority number, date | JP20040203622 | 09.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004203622 | [2007/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006439 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775483 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16B39/30 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
F16B35/048 (EP);
F16B39/30 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRAUBE MIT LOCKERUNGSSCHUTZ | [2007/16] | English: | ANTI-LOOSENING SCREW | [2007/16] | French: | VIS ANTI-DESSERRAGE | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2007 | Translation filed | 05.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/15] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6048150 (CLARKE RONALD C [US]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]US6135689 (MATSUNAMI SHIGEKI [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]WO02053926 (PARK HONG SOON [KR]) [Y] 1-4 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 17; figure - * | International search | [Y]JP3002824U ; | [Y]JPS5849013U ; | [Y]JP2004150618 (WATANABE TETSUYA); | [Y]JPH10246216 (MIYAKE AKIRA); | [Y]JP2003335105 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [Y]JP3014045U ; | [Y]JPS588816 (DAIICHI KOGYO KK); | [Y]JPS53155963U |