EP1768404 - OPTICAL DEVICE, REPRODUCTION DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND REPRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Tomoyuki Matsushita Elc.Ind.Co.Ltd Int.Pro.Rig.Opr.COm.IP Dev.Cen 19F Matsushita IMP 3-7 Shiromi 1Chome, Chuo Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Yoshihiro Matsushita Elc.Ind.Co.Ltd .Opr.COm.IP Dev.Cen 19F Matsushita IMP 3-7 Shiromi 1Chome, Chuo Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Wataru Matsushita Elc.Ind.Co.Ltd .Opr.COm.IP Dev.Cen 19F Matsushita IMP 3-7 Shiromi 1Chome, Chuo Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstraße 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05765467.5 | 05.07.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005JP12416 | Priority number, date | JP20040000199 | 06.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004000199 | [2007/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006004122 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768404 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/93, H04N5/937, H04N5/85, G11B20/10, G11B20/12 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/1251 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/937 (KR);
G11B2020/10537 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10759 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10916 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2541 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/41] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE EINRICHTUNG, WIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND WIEDERGABEVERFAHREN | [2007/13] | English: | OPTICAL DEVICE, REPRODUCTION DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND REPRODUCTION METHOD | [2007/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION, PROGRAMME, ET PROCEDE DE REPRODUCTION | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2006 | Translation filed | 18.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 09.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 17.06.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004023479 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-14* page 8, line 30 - page 11, line 10 * | International search | [Y]JP2001054059 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2003087745 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC); | [Y]JP2004128766 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) | Examination | EP1041566 | EP1619891 |