EP1783678 - DEVICE FOR SPECIFYING COMPANY EVALUATION CONTRIBUTION FACTOR AND/OR INDEX, SPECIFYING PROGRAM, AND SPECIFYING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Property Bank Corp. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | For all designated states Masuyama, Hiroaki 501, 9-30, Sakuranomachi 6-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0054 / JP | [2008/49] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Intellectual Property Bank Corp. 21-19, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Masuyama, Hiroaki 501, 9-30, Sakuranomachi 6-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUYAMA, Hiroaki 501, 9-30, Sakuranomachi 6-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 5600054 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMOTO, Kaoru Apt 102 Villa White Nagasaki 6-29-3 Nagasaki Toshima-ku, Tokyo 171-0051 / JP | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05765507.8 | 05.07.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005JP12429 | Priority number, date | JP20040198621 | 05.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004198621 | [2007/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006004132 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1783678 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06375 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0639 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | G06Q40/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM SPEZIFIZIEREN DES FIRMENEVALUIERUNGS-BEITRAGSFAKTORS UND/ODER INDEX, SPEZIFIZIERUNGSPROGRAMM UND SPEZIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR SPECIFYING COMPANY EVALUATION CONTRIBUTION FACTOR AND/OR INDEX, SPECIFYING PROGRAM, AND SPECIFYING METHOD | [2007/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE FACTEUR ET/OU D'INDICE CONTRIBUANT A L'ÉVALUATION D'ENTREPRISE, PROGRAMME DE DÉTERMINATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2007 | Translation filed | 05.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 24.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - "STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-6 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods(OJ 11/2007; p592-593) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [Y]US2003069822 (ITO KUNIO [JP], et al); | [A]US6556992 (BARNEY JONATHAN A [US], et al) | [Y] - NIIMI T., 2 Kakuzuke to Zaimu Shihyo no Kankei ni Tsuite, JAFEE Journal [1998] Risk Kanri to Kin'yu Shoken Toshi Senryaku, (19980319), pages 37 - 66, XP002997738 | [Y] - TATSUMI K., "Seminar Derivative to Shinkin'yu Shohin no Sugaku Kihon to Oyo", DAI 5 SHO TAJU KAIKI BUNSEKI TO TOSHI SENRYAKU, (19951208), pages 91 - 103, XP002997739 | [Y] - ONO T. ET AL, "A Study on Corporate Appraisal by Appraisal Purpose", NIPPON KEIEI KOGAKU KAISHI, (19860815), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 153 - 157, XP002997740 | [Y] - BRYNJOLFSSON E. ET AL, "Intangible Assets: How the Interaction of Computers and Organizational Structure Affects Stock Market Valuations", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION SYSTEMS 1998, (1998), XP002997741 | [Y] - JAPAN INDUSTRIAL MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION, Keiei Kogaku Handbook, (19940910), pages 582 - 598, XP002997742 |