EP1779197 - DISPLAY PANEL INCLUDIDNG PATTERNED SPACER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. LG Twin Tower 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sung-Hyun 105-901, Expo Apartment Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jin -Suek 239-7 Jungni-dong, Daedeok-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Kyung-Jun 12-204, KAIST Professor Apartment Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-350 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Seung-Hee 310-2 Bukgajwa 2-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-132 / KR | 05 /
KWON, Il-Eok 322-9 Dapsimni 5-dong, Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 130-035 / KR | 06 /
YOON, Jeong-Ae 1-408, Jeonwonpark Wanwol-dong, Happo-gu, Masan-si Gyeongsangnam-do 631-150 / KR | [2013/27] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
KIM, Sung-Hyun 105-901, Expo Apartment, Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Jin -Suek 239-7, Jungni-dong, Daedeok-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Kyung-Jun 12-204, KAIST Professor Apartment, Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-350 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Seung-Hee 310-2Bukgajwa 2-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-132 / KR | |||
05 /
KWON, Il-Eok 322-9 Dapsimni 5-dong, Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 130-035 / KR | |||
06 /
YOON, Jeong-Ae 1-408, Jeonwonpark Wanwol-dong, Happo-gu, Masan-si Gyeongsangnam-do 631-150 / KR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05765934.4 | 05.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005KR02121 | Priority number, date | KR20040052104 | 05.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004052104 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006004364 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779197 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1779197 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/028 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
G03F7/0007 (EP,US);
G03F7/028 (KR);
G03F7/0295 (EP,US);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US);
C09K2323/055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL MIT STRUKTURIERTEM ABSTANDSELEMENT | [2007/18] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL INCLUDIDNG PATTERNED SPACER | [2007/18] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE COMPRENANT UN ELEMENT D'ECARTEMENT PROFILE | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 27.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2005 | AT | 20.11.2013 | BE | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | ES | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | IT | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | NL | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | SE | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | IE | 05.07.2014 | LU | 05.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.07.2005 | |
AT | 20.11.2013 | ||
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0271195 (COOKSON GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0319296 (COOKSON GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0389236 (COOKSON GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2273101 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [Y]US2001012596 (KUNIMOTO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 10-17 * paragraphs [0206] , [0309]; claims 6,11,12,14 *; | [Y]EP1153935 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 10-17 * paragraphs [0013] , [0031] , [0 48]; claims 1,2 * | International search | [X]WO0196317 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al); | [Y]WO9805997 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2003207787 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003084117 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]WO03010602 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al); | [A]US4239850 (IKEDA SADAHARU [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2001151829 | WO0196317 | EP1153935 | JP2003207787 |