Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | MC | Lapse: 07.11.2012 | NL | | PL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 29.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | | 18.01.2007 | Search fee paid | | 18.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 18.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | European patent granted | 07.11.2012 | Opposition procedure | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2013 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 28.03.2007 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20070118 | | Event date: | 28.03.2007 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 28.03.2007 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | AL BA HR LV MK YU | | Event date: | 06.06.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | CHALLONER, PETER | | Event date: | 06.06.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | RODRIGUEZ, CARLOS | | Event date: | 06.06.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | TARARA, THOMAS, E. | | Event date: | 06.06.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | LORD, JOHN, D. | | Event date: | 06.06.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | SAMARA, EMIL | | Event date: | 13.05.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/12 20060101AFI20060207BHEP | | Event date: | 13.05.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 31/7036 20060101ALI20090404BHEP | | Event date: | 13.05.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61P 31/04 20060101ALI20090404BHEP | | Event date: | 13.05.2009 | | Event description: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20090415 | | Event date: | 29.07.2009 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC. | | Event date: | 29.07.2009 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NOVARTIS AG | | Event date: | 27.01.2010 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20091229 | | Event date: | 02.06.2010 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NOVARTIS AG | | Event date: | 18.04.2012 | | Event description: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | TOBRAMYCIN FORMUALTIONS FOR TREATMENT OF ENDOBRONCHIAL INFECTIONS | | Event date: | 07.11.2012 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | AL BA HR LV MK YU | | Event date: | 07.11.2012 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 07.11.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.11.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 05.12.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 03.01.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602005036894 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20130103 | | Event date: | 08.01.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 11.02.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 29.01.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20130123 | | Event date: | 27.02.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 27.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2399279 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20130327 | | Event date: | 03.04.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 13254 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 15.04.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E007505 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20130124 | | Event date: | 30.04.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT | | Event date: | 16.10.2013 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20130808 | | Event date: | 15.11.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 582690 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20121115 | | Event date: | 05.12.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602005036894 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20130808 | | Event date: | 28.11.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E017240 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121107 | | Event date: | 28.01.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO EPE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA | | Event date: | 29.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20130400186 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20130225 | | Event date: | 16.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.05.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 29.05.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 17.06.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE GB1A E007505 EE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE IN THE OWNERSHIP OR IN THE ADDRESS OF THE OWNER | | Event date: | 15.11.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | BOVARD SA NEUCHATEL CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INTE, CH | | Event date: | 15.11.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PUE | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT | OWNER: | BGP PRODUCTS OPERATIONS GMBH, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: NOVARTIS AG, CH | | Event date: | 19.11.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602005036894 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | BGP PRODUCTS OPERATIONS GMBH, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: NOVARTIS AG, 4056 BASEL, CH | | Event date: | 31.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR T1PR P20130076 HR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA | | Event date: | 29.01.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR TUEP P20130076 HR | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED | | Event date: | 17.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130076 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20190502 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 02.04.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | BGP PRODUCTS OPERATIONS GMBH; CH | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CESSION; FORMER OWNER NAME: NOVARTIS AG | Effective DATE: | 20200205 | | Event date: | 02.06.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK PC4A E 13254 SK | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT AND TRANSFER OF RIGHTS | OWNER: | BGP PRODUCTS OPERATIONS GMBH, ALLSCHWIL, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: NOVARTIS AG, BASEL, CH | Effective DATE: | 20200513 | | Event date: | 26.06.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130076 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20200602 | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 31.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SI SP73 | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER | OWNER: | BGP PRODUCTS OPERATIONS GMBH; CH | Effective DATE: | 20200609 | | Event date: | 28.10.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU FH1C | Code Expl.: | APPOINTMENT OF REPRESENTATIVE | Free Format Text: | FORMER REPRESENTATIVE(S): IFJ. SZENTPETERI ZSOLT, SBGK SZABADALMI UEGYVIVOEI IRODA, HU | REPRESENTATIVE: | SBGK SZABADALMI UEGYVIVOEI IRODA, HU | | Event date: | 28.10.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU GB9C | Code Expl.: | SUCCESSION IN TITLE | OWNER: | BGP PRODUCTS OPERATIONS GMBH, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER(S): NOVARTIS AG, CH | | Event date: | 09.01.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI PCE | Code Expl.: | NEW ASSIGNEE OR OWNER (EP PATENT) | OWNER: | BGP PRODUCTS OPERATIONS GMBH | | Event date: | 05.10.2012 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 31.08.2012 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 18.04.2012 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 23.02.2007 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 13.09.2013 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 06.08.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130076 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20210609 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 13.09.2013 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 08.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130076 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20220607 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 23.06.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130076 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20230608 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 12.07.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230530 | | Event date: | 21.06.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130076 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20240610 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Payment DATE: | 20240627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 05.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20240618 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 08.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20240618 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 09.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Payment DATE: | 20240607 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 10.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20240627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 11.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20240624 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 15.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20240619 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 15.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20240625 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 18.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20240625 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 23.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20240618 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 23.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20240612 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20240610 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20240606 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20240627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20240627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20240624 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20240625 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20240617 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20240606 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20240612 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20240625 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20240621 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20240624 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20240610 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.09.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20240619 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 21.10.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20240710 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 21.10.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20240701 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 25.10.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20240606 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | |