EP1773325 - METHODS OF USING ALBUTEROL AND CALCIUM ACTIVATED POTASSIUM CHANNEL OPENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEPRACOR, INC. 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states SEPRACOR, INC. 84 waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBERICH, Timothy, J. 40 Elm Street Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05766071.4 | 14.06.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005US21171 | Priority number, date | US20040578827P | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 578827 P | US20040599027P | 06.08.2004 Original published format: US 599027 P | US20040607290P | 07.09.2004 Original published format: US 607290 P | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005123071 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1773325 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/41, A61K31/54, A61K31/70, A61K31/135, A61K31/415, A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61P11/08 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,US);
A61K31/54 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/41, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/54, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2007/16] | A61K31/41, A61K31/54, A61K31/70, A61K31/135, A61K31/415 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | 15.01.2007 | BA | 15.01.2007 | HR | 15.01.2007 | LV | 15.01.2007 | MK | 15.01.2007 | YU | 15.01.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON ALBUTEROL UND CALCIUM AKTIVIERTE KALIUMKANALÖFFNER | [2007/16] | English: | METHODS OF USING ALBUTEROL AND CALCIUM ACTIVATED POTASSIUM CHANNEL OPENERS | [2007/16] | French: | METHODES D'UTILISATION D'ALBUTEROL ET D'AGENTS INDUISANT L'OUVERTURE DES CANAUX POTASSIQUES ACTIVES PAR LE CALCIUM | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/49] | 28.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2009 | 03.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004109826 (MALLADI RAMANA [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 47 *; | [Y] - COSTELLO ET AL, "Prospects for improved therapy in chronic obstructive pulmonary disease by the use of levalbuterol", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY - YEARLY BOOK, INC, US, (199908), vol. 104, no. 2, ISSN 0091-6749, pages S61 - S68, XP005686959 [Y] 1-40 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(99)70275-7 | [Y] - REVEL L ET AL, "CR 2039, a new bis-(1H-tetrazol-5-yl)phenylbenzamide derivative with potential for the topical treatment of asthma", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19921208), vol. 229, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 45 - 53, XP002305101 [Y] 1-40 * abstract * * page 45, column 2, line 13 - line 17 * * page 52, column 2, line 42 - line 46 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(92)90284-B | [Y] - GRAUL A I, "RESPIRATORY DRUG DEVELOPMENT COMPENDIUM 2002 ALLERGIC RHINITIS", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, BARCELONA, ES, (200212), vol. 27, no. 12, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 1181 - 1194, XP009013244 [Y] 1-40 * page 1188, column 2, line 9 - line 12 * * page 1189; table V * | [Y] - RAMNARINE SEAN I ET AL, "Neuroregulation of mucus secretion by opioid receptors and KATP and BKCa channels in ferret trachea in vitro", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (199804), vol. 123, no. 8, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1631 - 1638, XP002451408 [Y] 1-40 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0701786 | [Y] - ARCH J R S ET AL, "Evaluation of the novel potassium channel activator BRL 55834 as an inhaled bronchodilator in guinea-pigs and rats: Comparison with levcromakalim and salbutamol", PULMONARY PHARMACOLOGY, (1994), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 0952-0600, pages 121 - 128, XP002449872 [Y] 1-40 * page 127, column 2, paragraph 2 * | International search | [Y]US6555583 (NIEMAN RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US6083993 (BARBERICH TIMOTHY J [US], et al); | [Y]US5976576 (MAKOVEC FRANCESCO [IT], et al); | [Y]US5776734 (KACZOROWSKI GREGORY J [US], et al); | [Y]US5200422 (OLESEN SOREN-PETER [DK], et al); | [Y]US6656461 (D ARMIENTO JEANINE [US], et al); | [Y]US2003149029 (MCKEW JOHN C [US], et al); | [Y]WO2004035570 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al) |