EP1766969 - STREAM RECORDING/REPRODUCING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATSU, Etsuto c/o Matsushita El Ind Co, Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 05766184.5 | 11.07.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005JP13199 | Priority number, date | JP20040204367 | 12.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004204367 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006709 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1766969 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/92, G11B20/10, H04N9/80, G11B27/034, G11B27/32 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2516 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2541 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US);
G11B2220/455 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/42] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMAUFZEICHNUNGS-/WIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2007/13] | English: | STREAM RECORDING/REPRODUCING APPARATUS | [2007/13] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT/REPRODUCTION DE FLUX | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]JP2003032617 ; | [XA]US2001024562 (NOMURA YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,12-19 * paragraphs [0070] , [0046] , [0105] , [0116] * [A] 3-7,10; | [X]WO03047261 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 6 * * page 37, line 1 - page 40, line 28 * * figures 22,35,36 *; | [X]US2003118330 (ITO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12 * paragraphs [0026] , [0028] - [0031] - [0035]; figure 4 *; | [A] - H S KONG, A VETRO, H SUN, "Optimal MPEG-2 Transcoding for DVD Recording System", MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC RESEARCH LABORATORY, (200306), URL: http://www.merl.com/reports/docs/TR2003-76.pdf, (20051014), XP002349903 [A] 1-19 * par.1 : Introduction * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030512), vol. 2003, no. 05, & JP2003032617 A 20030131 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [AD] 1-19 * abstract * |