EP1801376 - METHOD OF MEASURING NOx REDUCTION RATE OF EXHAUST EMISSION CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hino-dai 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUMAGARI, Ichiro c/o Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hinodai 3-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 1918660 / JP | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Köhler, Walter Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Merianstraße 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Köhler, Walter Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05766446.8 | 21.07.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005JP13365 | Priority number, date | JP20040215767 | 23.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004215767 | [2007/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006009196 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801376 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801376 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, B01D53/94, F01N9/00 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F01N11/00 (KR);
B01D53/9409 (EP,US);
F01N11/002 (EP,US);
F01N3/00 (KR);
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2067 (EP,US);
F01N2560/026 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | F01N3/20, B01D53/94 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER NOX-REDUKTIONSRATE EINER ABGASENTGIFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/26] | English: | METHOD OF MEASURING NOx REDUCTION RATE OF EXHAUST EMISSION CONTROL DEVICE | [2007/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURER LE TAUX DE RÉDUCTION DE NOx D'UN DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2007 | Translation filed | 22.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 24.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | [2011/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4751054 (WATANABE TSUYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1024254 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [A]US6119448 (ZUTHER FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-4; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2003051468 (VAN NIEUWSTADT MICHIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0080] *; | [A]EP1334760 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0040]; figure 2 * | International search | [A]JPH0783073 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2002047979 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2000352306 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD); | [A]JPH11257053 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPH11229850 (NISSAN MOTOR) | by applicant | JP2002161732 | JP2002513110 |