EP1767504 - PHOSPHORIC ESTER POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMADA, Daisuke c/o Kao corporation, Research Lab. 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 02 /
HAMAI, Toshimasa c/o Kao Corp., Research Lab. 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 03 /
SHIMODA, Masaaki c/o Kao Corp., Research Lab. 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 04 /
KONO, Yoshinao c/o Kao Corp., Research Lab. 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 05 /
TANISHO, Yoshiaki c/o Kao Corp., Research Lab. 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 06 /
MORII, Yoshikazu c/o Kao Corp., Research Lab. 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 07 /
NAKA, Yoshihito c/o Kao Corp., Research Lab. 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05766531.7 | 13.07.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005JP13342 | Priority number, date | JP20040209044 | 15.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004209044 | [2007/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006732 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1767504 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1767504 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/26, C04B28/02, C08F220/28, C08F230/02, C08F290/06, C04B103/40 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
C08F290/06 (EP,US);
C08F220/10 (KR);
C04B24/246 (EP,US);
C04B24/26 (KR);
C04B28/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B24/246 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | C04B24/26, C04B28/02, C08F220/28, C08F230/02, C08F290/06, // C04B103/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [2007/43] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PHOSPHORSÄUREESTERPOLYMER | [2007/13] | English: | PHOSPHORIC ESTER POLYMER | [2007/13] | French: | POLYMÈRES D'ESTERS PHOSPHORIQUES | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2006 | Translation filed | 15.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 17.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3855364 (STECKLER R) [A] 1-9 * column 3, lines 13-56; example 1 ** column 5, lines 34-40 *; | [XDY]JP2000327386 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP) [XD] 7-13 * Working example; paragraphs [0001] , [0013] , [0020] , [0025] * [Y] 1-8; | [Y]WO0174909 (RHODIA [US]) [Y] 8 * page 1, line 38 - page 2, line 23 * * page 1, lines 12-24 *; | [Y]EP1300426 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0037] , [0090] , [0101] , [0176] , [0209] * | International search | [Y]JP2000327386 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP); | [Y]JP2004075977 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) | by applicant | JPH1179811 | JP2000327386 | WO0174909 | EP1300426 |