EP1771102 - CONFORMABLE POD FOR A MANUAL IMPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Willat Ergonomic Technologies, LLC 9120 Oriole Way Los Angeles, CA 90069 / US | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLAT, Boyd, L. 9120 Oriole Way Los Angeles, CA 90069 / US | 02 /
CORDOVA, Adrian 4712 Fairport San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
PORTILLO, Robert C. 2740 Flower Fields Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | 04 /
DELGADO, Gary D. 509 West 121 st Street, Apt. 809 New York, NY 10027 / US | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05766658.8 | 21.06.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005US22013 | Priority number, date | US20040582263P | 22.06.2004 Original published format: US 582263 P | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006002208 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1771102 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A46B5/02, B25G1/10, B32B1/06, A47C7/70, A61B17/28 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B25G1/102 (EP,US);
A61B17/2841 (EP,US);
A47J36/04 (EP,US);
A47J45/06 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0042 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00424 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | A46B5/02, B25G1/10, B32B1/06 | ||
Former IPC [2007/15] | A47C20/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/42] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSCHMIEGBARER HALTER FÜR EIN HANDUTENSIL | [2007/15] | English: | CONFORMABLE POD FOR A MANUAL IMPLEMENT | [2007/15] | French: | MODULE CONFORMABLE POUR ACCESSOIRE MANUEL | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/28] | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4404820 (ROMAINE JOHN W [US]); | [XY]US2002119270 (DANIEL FERRARA A [US]); | [XA]WO03005858 (BIC CORP [US]); | [X]US2003024543 (WOLF SHANE D [US]); | [XY]US2003123917 (WILLAT BOYD [US], et al); | [XY]EP1419856 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) | International search | [X]US2002119270 (DANIEL FERRARA A [US]); | [Y]US2003088946 (FERGUSON DENNIS E [US], et al); | [X]US6725505 (WILLAT BOYD I [US]); | [XE]US7004655 (FERRARA DANIEL A [US]); | [XE]US2006174450 (CHEN SHIOW-HUI [TW]) | by applicant | US2003024543 |