EP1904465 - METHOD OF SYNTHESIS OF IMIDAZOLE-AMINO ACID DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HLASTA, Dennis, J. 5008 Davis Drive Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | 02 /
ZIFICSAK, Craig, A. 106 Newport Court Harleysville, PA 19438 / US | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Warner, James Alexander Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Warner, James Alexander Carpmaels & Ransford 43 -45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05766686.9 | 29.06.2005 | [2008/14] | WO2005US23048 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007005000 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1904465 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1904465 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/24, C07D413/06, C07D233/54, C07D405/04 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D405/06 (EP);
C07D413/06 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | 21.01.2008 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON IMIDAZOLAMINOSÄUREDERIVATEN UND VERWANDTEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2008/14] | English: | METHOD OF SYNTHESIS OF IMIDAZOLE-AMINO ACID DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS | [2008/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE D IMIDAZOLE- DÉRIVÉS D ACIDES AMINÉS ET COMPOSÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.06.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IT | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | ES | 12.07.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5360811 (TEGELER JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 31 * compound 186 *; | [XA] - DONG ET AL, "Total Synthesis of Exochelin MN and Analogues", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 67, no. 14, pages 4759 - 4770, XP002371209 [X] 29 * page 4761; compounds 24,25 * * page 4761, scheme 2 * [A] 1-28,30-56 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo0256078 | [X] - OTSUKA ET AL, "Synthetic study towards man-designed bleomycins. Synthesis of a DNA cleaving molecule based on bleomycin", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1986), vol. 27, no. 31, pages 3639 - 3642, XP002371210 [X] 29 * page 3640; 2-t-butoxycarbonyl proteceted compound II (intermediate) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)84869-8 | [X] - KITTAKA ET AL, "Transition-metal binding site of bleomycin. A remarkably efficient dioxygen-activating molecule based on bleomycin-Fe(II) complex", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1986), vol. 27, no. 31, pages 3631 - 3634, XP002371211 [X] 29 * page 3632; compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)84867-4 | [X] - HECHT ET AL, "Synthesis of L-erythro-beta-Hydroxyhistidine from D-Glucosamine", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1979), vol. 101, pages 3982 - 3983, XP002371212 [X] 29 * page 3982; compound 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00508a055 | [X] - KITTAKA ET AL, "Synthetic models for the transition metal binding site of bleomycin. Remarkable improvement of dioxygen activating capability", TETRAHEDRON, (1988), vol. 44, no. 10, pages 2811 - 2820, XP002371213 [X] 29 * page 2814; compounds 12,13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(88)90017-8 | [X] - DONDONI ET AL, "Chelation- and Non-chelation-Controlled Addition of 2-(Trimethylsilyl)thiazole to .alpha.-Amino Aldehydes: Stereoselective Synthesis of the .beta.-Amino-.alpha.-hydroxy Aldehyde Intermediate for the Preparation of the Human Immunodeficiency Virus Proteinase Inhibitor Ro 31-8959", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 60, no. 24, pages 8074 - 8080, XP002371214 [X] 31 * page 8075; compounds 15,18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00129a057 | [X] - DONDONI ET AL, "Total Synthesis of (+)-Galactostatin. An Illustration of the Utility of the Thiazole-Aldehyde Synthesis", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 60, no. 15, pages 4749 - 4754, XP002371215 [X] 31 * page 4752 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00120a017 | [X] - DONDONI ET AL, "2-Thiazolyl ?-Amino Ketones: A New Class of Reactive Intermediates for the Stereocontrolled Synthesis of Unusual Amino Acids", SYNTHESIS, (1993), vol. 11, pages 1162 - 1176, XP002371216 [X] 31 * page 1165; compounds 17A-B, 19A-B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1993-26021 | by applicant | US5360811 | - DONG, J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 67, pages 4759 - 4770 | - OTSUKA, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 27, no. 31, pages 3639 - 3642 | - KITTAKA, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 27, no. 31, pages 3631 - 3634 | - KITTAKA ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, vol. 11, no. 10, pages 2811 - 2820 | - DONDONI, J. ORG. CHEM., (1995), vol. 60, pages 4749 - 4754 | - DONDONI, SYNTHESIS, (1993), vol. 11, pages 1162 - 1176 |