EP1753986 - INFINITELY-VARIABLE TRANSMISSION WITH DOUBLE MODE POWER TRANSMISSION CONTROLLED BY A SLIDING DOG FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2011/29] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARTHUISOT, Jean-Pierre 4, rue de Verdun F-92000 Nanterre / FR | 02 /
CASENAZ, Robert 13, rue de la Danne Mauve F-95610 Eragny sur Oise / FR | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/10] |
Former [2010/29] | Caillet, Isabelle, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05766717.2 | 23.05.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005FR50349 | Priority number, date | FR20040005686 | 26.05.2004 Original published format: FR 0405686 | [2007/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005119101 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1753986 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1753986 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/30, B60K6/365, B60K6/387, F16H3/72 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
F16H63/30 (KR);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
F16H3/728 (EP,US);
F16H63/3023 (EP,US);
F16H2037/102 (EP,US);
F16H2037/104 (EP,US);
F16H2037/106 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | F16H63/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNENDLICH VARIABLES GETRIEBE MIT VON EINER GLEITMUFFE GESTEUERTEN KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNG MIT ZWEIFACHEM MODUS FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2007/08] | English: | INFINITELY-VARIABLE TRANSMISSION WITH DOUBLE MODE POWER TRANSMISSION CONTROLLED BY A SLIDING DOG FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/08] | French: | TRANSMISSION INFINIMENT VARIABLE A DERIVATION DE PUISSANCE A DEUX MODES DE FONCTIONNEMENT COMMANDEE PAR UN BALADEUR A CRABOT, POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2005 | AT | 20.07.2011 | CY | 20.07.2011 | CZ | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | IE | 20.07.2011 | IT | 20.07.2011 | LT | 20.07.2011 | NL | 20.07.2011 | PL | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | BG | 20.10.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | IS | 20.11.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 20.07.2011 | |
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 20.07.2011 | |
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 20.07.2011 | |
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1172982 (AUTO TRANSMISSIONS LTD [GB]) [A] 7 * figure 4 *; | [YA]US3866490 (ORSHANSKY JR ELIAS) [Y] 1,4 * column 5, lines 5-13 * * column 15, line 30 - column 16, line 13 * * figures 2,16 * [A] 5,6,9; | [Y]US5006100 (BRANDT CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,8 * column 4, lines 13-68; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5935035 (SCHMIDT MICHAEL ROLAND [US]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]FR2847014 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [Y] 1-4,8 * the whole document * |