EP1904880 - OPTICAL MULTI-THREAD PLUG CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIAMOND S.A. Via dei Patrizi 5 CH-6616 Losone-Locarno / CH | For all designated states Data Pixel SAS 11 Route de la salle 74960 Cran Gévrier / FR | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEREL, Loic 20 Rue Andre Gide F-74000 Annecy / FR | 02 /
CALOZ, François Via Ronco 28d CH-6618 Arcegno / CH | 03 /
ROSSETTO, Aaron Via San Gottardo 63 CH-6596 Gordola / CH | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Wenger, René, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Wenger, René, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 05766807.1 | 15.07.2005 | [2008/14] | WO2005EP53421 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007009491 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1904880 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
G02B6/3885 (EP,US);
G02B6/3851 (EP,US);
G02B6/3882 (EP,US);
G02B6/3897 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER MEHRFASER-STECKERANSCHLUSS | [2008/14] | English: | OPTICAL MULTI-THREAD PLUG CONNECTION | [2008/14] | French: | CONNEXION ENFICHABLE MULTIFIBRE OPTIQUE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4217029 (KAO CHARLES K [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,5 *; | [Y]US4861132 (MOULIN NORBERT L [US]) [Y] 8,10 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1028335 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1* figures 1,3a *; | [Y]US6146024 (MELCHIOR LUTZ [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US6215555 (CHIVERS JAMES T [US]) [Y] 18 * abstract *; | [XY]US2004117981 (ROTH RICHARD F [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * figures 2,4,5c,5d * [Y] 4,5,8,10,18 |