Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8674106 | ![]() | 18.03.2014 | B2 | US2013178631 | 11.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113332364 | 20.12.2011 | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | US63001306 | 18.12.2006 | US201213549411 | 13.07.2012 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8883826 | ![]() | 11.11.2014 | B2 | US2012277237 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113332364 | 20.12.2011 | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | US63001306 | 18.12.2006 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8101637 | ![]() | 24.01.2012 | B2 | US2009124625 | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101200175B | ![]() | 13.11.2012 | B1 | KR20070054624 | 29.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5053840B | ![]() | 24.10.2012 | B2 | JP2008502674 | 31.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2426115 | ![]() | 03.09.2014 | A3 | EP2426115 | 07.03.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05766895 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005254808B | ![]() | 19.04.2012 | B2 | AU2005254808 | 29.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1765795 | ![]() | 06.03.2013 | B1 | EP1765795 | 28.03.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0511072 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0511072 | 27.08.2019 | B1 | BRPI0511072 | 27.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2570987 | 03.12.2013 | C | CA2570987 | 29.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101001846B | 07.11.2012 | B | CN101001846 | 18.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1114582T | 05.10.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP05766895 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1765795T | 03.06.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA012206 | 28.08.2009 | B1 | EA200700047 | 29.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2404034T | 23.05.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1101178 | 12.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL179692 | 28.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06014721 | 22.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO339660B | 16.01.2017 | B1 | NO20070288L | 16.01.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ551664 | 27.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1765795T | 31.07.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05766895 | 17.06.2005 | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1765795T | 28.06.2013 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP05766895 | 17.06.2005 | WO2005IB02390 | 17.06.2005 | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005123703 | ![]() | 15.02.2007 | A8 | WO2005123703 | 12.10.2006 | A3 | WO2005123703 | 29.12.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012051937 | ![]() | 15.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102993084B | 20.05.2015 | B | CN102993084 | 27.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA200970326 | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0413605D0 | 21.07.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1765795E | 17.04.2013 | E | Priority number | Date | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA87856 | 25.08.2009 | C2 | Priority number | Date | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200610023 | 27.08.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | GB0413605 | 17.06.2004 | Type | ![]() | EP2426115 |