EP1773125 - 5-IODOTETRAZOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UHR, Hermann Christian-Hess-Str.81 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
BRUNS, Rainer Erlenweg 4a 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
VOGL, Erasmus Am Alten Schafstall 12 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
KUGLER, Martin Am Kloster 47 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 05 /
KRETSCHIK, Oliver Adamsstr. 40 51063 Leverkusen / DE | 06 /
NEUMANN, Bernhard Berhardystr. 4 06110 Halle/S. / DE | [2007/30] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
UHR, Hermann Christian-Hess-Str.81 51373 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02 /
BRUNS, Rainer Walter-Flex-Str. 9 51373 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03 /
VOGL, Erasmus Hardenbergstr. 43 51373 Leverkusen / DE | |||
04 /
KUGLER, Martin Am Kloster 47 42799 Leichlingen / DE | |||
05 /
KRETSCHIK, Oliver Adamsstr. 40 51063 Leverkusen / DE | |||
06 /
NEUMANN, Bernhard Berhardystr. 4 06110 Halle/S. / DE | Application number, filing date | 05766973.1 | 19.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005EP07824 | Priority number, date | DE20041037366 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004037366 | [2007/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006012996 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1773125 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1773125 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/713, C07D257/04 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
A01N43/713 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
C07D257/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 5-IODTETRAZOLE | [2007/16] | English: | 5-IODOTETRAZOLES | [2007/16] | French: | 5-IODE TETRAZOLE | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.05.2008 | CZ | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | EE | 21.05.2008 | IE | 21.05.2008 | LT | 21.05.2008 | LV | 21.05.2008 | NL | 21.05.2008 | PL | 21.05.2008 | RO | 21.05.2008 | SI | 21.05.2008 | SK | 21.05.2008 | TR | 21.05.2008 | LU | 19.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | BG | 21.08.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | IS | 21.09.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | HU | 22.11.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 21.05.2008 | |
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
TR | 21.05.2008 | ||
LU | 19.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
HU | 22.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
LU | 19.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
LV | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | LV | 21.05.2008 | |
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | LV | 21.05.2008 | |
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 21.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0107859 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 21 ** page 23, line 7 - page 34, line 25 *; | [X] - Y.SATOH ET AL., "Application of 5-lithiotetrazoles in organic synthesis", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 123:55771, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002351051 [X] 5,6,8-10 * column A * * siehe IT: Register Nummer 164589-78-0 * | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1995), vol. 36, no. 11, pages 1759 - 1762 | [X] - Y.V. GRIGOR'EV ET AL., "Synthesis of 5-iodotetrazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 116:255555, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002351052 [X] 5,6,8-10 * column A * * siehe index terms "IT": Register-Nummern; Registernumer: 141651-17-4 * | [ ] - VESTSI AKADEMII NAVUK BELARSI, SERYYA KHIMICHNYKH NAVUK, (1992), no. 1, pages 73 - 77 | [X] - P.N.GAPONIK ET AL., "Direct iodination of 1-alkyltetrazoles - a simple route to 1-alkyl-5-iodotetrazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 111:194674, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002351053 [X] 5,6,9,10 * column A * | [ ] - KHIMIYA GETEROTSIKLICHESKIKH SOEDINENII, (1988), no. 12, page 1699 | [X] - V.V.NEDEL'KO ET AL., "Thermal decomposition of C-iodotetrazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 125:10018, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002351054 [X] 5,6,10 * column A * | [ ] - IZVESTIYA AKADEMII NAUK, SERIYA KHIMICHESKAYA, (1996), no. 1, pages 68 - 71 | [X] - C.R.JACOBSON ET AL., "Tetrazole chemistry. II. The synthesis and reactions of 1-phenyl-5-acetyltetrazole", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 49:84232, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002351055 [X] 5,6,10 * column A * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1954), vol. 19, pages 1652 - 1661 | [X] - V.V.NEDLE'KO ET AL., "Thermal decomposition of 1-ethyl-5-iodotetrazole", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 122:264790, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002351056 [X] 5,6,10 * column A * | [ ] - IZVESTIYA AKADEMII NAUK, SERIYA KHIMICHESKAYA, (1994), no. 11, pages 1923 - 1926 |