03.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
27.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
29.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
27.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
27.03.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
20.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
27.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
20.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
16.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
26.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] |
14.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
26.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
18.04.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
27.03.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.03.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.12.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.12.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.08.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
22.06.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
11.05.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.05.2007 |
First examination report |
|
06.04.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
16.03.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
16.03.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
08.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|