Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8048903 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2011 | B2 | US2009036506 | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP07824 | 19.07.2005 | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4819048B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2011 | B2 | JP2008507572 | 13.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP07824 | 19.07.2005 | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005269011 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP07824 | 19.07.2005 | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1773125 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2008 | B1 | EP1773125 | 18.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP07824 | 19.07.2005 | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0513950 | 20.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP07824 | 19.07.2005 | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502005004210D1 | 03.07.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP07824 | 19.07.2005 | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1101667 | 26.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP07824 | 19.07.2005 | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20071100L | 27.02.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP07824 | 19.07.2005 | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ552820 | 24.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP07824 | 19.07.2005 | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006012996 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE395827T | 15.06.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100548123C | 14.10.2009 | C | CN1993049 | 04.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101684104 | 31.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004037366 | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2306185T | 01.11.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2417589 | 27.09.2011 | C9 | RU2417589 | 10.05.2011 | C2 | RU2007107172 | 10.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200700739 | 25.06.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | DE102004037366 | 30.07.2004 |