EP1774156 - CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASHIKI, Zenichiro, TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Naoto TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05767332.9 | 21.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005JP13796 | Priority number, date | JP20040214623 | 22.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004214623 | JP20050054103 | 28.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005054103 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006009312 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774156 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1774156 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D35/02 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
F02D35/027 (EP,US);
F02D41/3094 (EP,US);
F02D41/401 (EP,US);
F02P5/152 (EP,US);
F02D2041/281 (EP,US);
F02D2250/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/44] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2007/16] | English: | CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2007/16] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003230281 (HOSHINO MASATO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0047] *; | [A]JP2002227697 ; | [A]JPH11229951 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021212), vol. 2002, no. 12, & JP2002227697 A 20020814 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1,3,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11229951 A 19990824 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1,3,7,9 * abstract * |