EP1774910 - MEDICAL IMAGE DIAGNOSIS ASSISTING SYSTEM, DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKASHIMA, Kuniyoshi 2-12-2-101, Kashiwanoha, Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 2770882 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Yoshihiro 3-6-1-531, Minamimizumoto, Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 1250035 / JP | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Buchetmann, Dominik Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Buchetmann, Dominik Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05767345.1 | 28.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005JP13819 | Priority number, date | JP20040222711 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004222711 | [2007/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006011545 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774910 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, A61B5/00, A61B5/055, A61B8/00, G06T1/00 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G06T7/0014 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/463 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10072 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30061 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/45] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES BILDDIAGNOSE-UNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND BILDBEARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2007/16] | English: | MEDICAL IMAGE DIAGNOSIS ASSISTING SYSTEM, DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM | [2007/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE AU DIAGNOSTIC MÉDICAL PAR IMAGE, DISPOSITIF ET PROGRAMME DE TRAIEMENT D'IMAGE | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2007 | Translation filed | 21.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 30.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003018245 (KAUFMAN LEON [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,10 * paragraphs [0063] , [0066] , [0070] , [0075] ** figures 4-6,9 *; | [X]JP2003070781 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0030] , [0033]; figures 9,11,13 *; | [X]US2003103665 (UPPALURI RENUKA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * paragraphs [0034] , [0049] - [0060] - [0068] , [0076] , [0164] * * figures 2,13 *; | [X]US2003179915 (GOTO YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-7,10 * paragraphs [0321] , [0352] , [0353]; figures 1,3,31,40,43,68,69,80 *; | [X]US2004086162 (DOI KUNIO [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10 * paragraphs [0046] , [0064] , [0084]; figures 2,8A-8E *; | [X]US2004101089 (KARAU KELLY LYNN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * paragraph [0045]; figures 3,4,6-8 * | International search | [Y]JPH08110939 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [Y]JPH09167238 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004180932 (TOSHIBA CORP) | by applicant | JP2003010171 | US2003018245 | JP2003070781 | US2003103665 | US2003179915 | US2004086162 | US2004101089 | JP2004222711 |