EP1756108 - Azaindoles useful as inhibitors of ROCK and other protein kinases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/09] | AZAINDOLES USEFUL AS INHIBITORS OF ROCK AND OTHER PROTEIN KINASES | ||
[2012/17] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Jeremy 125 Lincoln Wood Road Waltham, MA 2451 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Andrew Cherry Cottage, Chilton Road Upton, Oxfordshire OX11 9JL / GB | 03 /
JIMENEZ, Juan-Miguel 39 Alexander Close Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 1XA / GB | 04 /
MARHEFKA, Craig 11411 Eunice Ct. White Marsh, Maryland 21162 / US | 05 /
CAO, Jingrong 45 Madison Avenue Newton, MA 02165 / US | 06 /
COURT, John, J. 27 Ernies Drive Littleton, MA 01460 / US | 07 /
BANDARAGE, Upul, K. 11 Bates Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 08 /
GAO, Huai 25 Sunnyside Lane Lincoln, MA 01773 / US | 09 /
NANTHAKUMAR, Suganthini 253 Spiers Road Newton, MA 02459 / US | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/09] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05767612.4 | 04.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US11358 | Priority number, date | US20040559041P | 02.04.2004 Original published format: US 559041 P | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005103050 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1756108 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P37/08, A61P29/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4353 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/08 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/16 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | 11.10.2006 | BA | 11.10.2006 | HR | 11.10.2006 | LV | 11.10.2006 | MK | 11.10.2006 | YU | 11.10.2006 | Title | German: | Azaindole zur Verwendung als Inhibitoren von ROCK und anderen Proteinkinasen | [2012/17] | English: | Azaindoles useful as inhibitors of ROCK and other protein kinases | [2012/17] | French: | Azaindoles utiles en tant qu'inhibiteurs de la protéine kinase de la famille ROCK et d'autres protéines kinases | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/09] | ALS INHIBITOREN VON ROCK UND ANDEREN PROTEINKINASEN NÜTZLICHE AZAINDOLE | ||
Former [2007/09] | AZAINDOLES USEFUL AS INHIBITORS OF ROCK AND OTHER PROTEIN KINASES | ||
Former [2007/09] | AZAINDOLES UTILES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTEINE SERINE/THREONINE KINASE SUPERHELICE DE LA FAMILLE RHO (ROCK) ET D'AUTRES PROTEINES KINASES | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9965897 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1,41,43 * claims 1,73,82,84 *; | [A]WO03028724 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,41,45 * claims 1,7-9 *; | [A]WO03082869 (EISAI LONDON RES LAB LIMTED [GB], et al) [A] 1,41,45 * claims 1,7,16-38 *; | [A]WO2004016610 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,41,45 * claims 1,6-9 *; | [AP]WO2004078756 (EISAI LONDON RES LAB LTD [GB], et al) [AP] 1-52* claims 1-5,7,9,84-111 * | by applicant | - HANKS, S.K.; HUNTER, T., FASEB J, (1995), vol. 9, pages 576 - 596 | - KAWAKAMI ET AL., JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), pages 3556 - 3562 | - KAWAKAMI ET AL., JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, vol. 65, pages 286 - 290 | - MUKHOPADHYAY ET AL., JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 168, pages 2914 - 2921 |