EP1718770 - LEPTIN PROMOTER POLYMORPHISMS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Governors of the University of Alberta TEC Edmonton Suite 4000 8308-114 Street NW Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states The Governors of the University of Alberta TEC Edmonton, Suite 4000, 8308-114 Street, Research Transition Facility, University of Alberta Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | ||
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states The Governors of the University of Alberta TEC Edmonton, Suite 400, 8308-114 Street, Research Transition Facility, University of Alberta Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Stephen, Stewart 11143-64th Avenue Edmonton, Alberta T6H 1T4 / CA | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05767641.3 | 19.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005IB02000 | Priority number, date | US20040546456P | 19.02.2004 Original published format: US 546456 P | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005112544 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1718770 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1718770 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 27.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/04 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/124 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEPTINPROMOTOR-POLYMORPHISMEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2006/45] | English: | LEPTIN PROMOTER POLYMORPHISMS AND USES THEREOF | [2006/45] | French: | POLYMORPHISMES DU PROMOTEUR DE LA LEPTINE ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 20.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2005 | AT | 25.05.2011 | BE | 25.05.2011 | CY | 25.05.2011 | CZ | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | FI | 25.05.2011 | IT | 25.05.2011 | LT | 25.05.2011 | NL | 25.05.2011 | PL | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | SE | 25.05.2011 | SI | 25.05.2011 | SK | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | ES | 05.09.2011 | IS | 25.09.2011 | PT | 26.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
PT | 26.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03097876 (MARQUESS FOLEY LEIGH SHAW [CA]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X] - BUCHANAN F C ET AL, "ASSOCIATION OF A MISSENSE MUTATION IN THE BOVINE LEPTIN GENE WITH CARCASS FAT CONTENT AND LEPTIN MRNA LEVELS", GENETICS SELECTION EVOLUTION, EDP SCIENCES, LES ULIS,, FR, (200201), vol. 34, no. 1, ISSN 1297-9686, pages 105 - 116, XP008023609 [X] 1,5,7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1051/gse:2001006 | [X] - TANIGUCHI Y ET AL, "GENOMIC STRUCTURE AND PROMOTER ANALYSIS OF THE BOVINE LEPTIN GENE", IUBMB LIFE, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS, LONDON,, GB, (200202), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 1521-6543, pages 131 - 135, XP008072975 [X] 7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15216540211465 | [X] - "Bos taurus leptin gene, exon 2 and partial cds.", EMBL, (20021008), Database accession no. AY138588, URL: EBI, XP002469502 [X] 7,8 * the whole document * | [X] - LIEFERS S C ET AL, "ASSOCIATION OF LEPTIN GENE POLYMORPHISMS WITH SERUM LEPTIN CONCENTRATION IN DAIRY COWS", MAMMALIAN GENOME, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200309), vol. 14, no. 9, ISSN 0938-8990, pages 657 - 663, XP008072974 [X] 7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00335-003-2275-y | [PX] - NKRUMAH J D ET AL, "Polymorphisms in the bovine leptin promoter associated with serum concentration, growth, feed intake, feeding behaviour, and measures of carcass merit", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200501), vol. 83, no. 1, ISSN 0021-8812, pages 20 - 28, XP003014232 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document * | [PX] - SCHENKEL F S ET AL, "Association of single nucleotide polymorphisms in the leptin gene with carcass and meat quality traits of beef cattle", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, (200509), vol. 83, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8812, pages 2009 - 2020, XP002469500 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - LIEFERS S C ET AL, "ASSOCIATIONS BETWEEN LEPTIN GENE POLYMORPHISMS AND PRODUCTION, LIVE WEIGHT, ENERGY BALANCE, FEED INTAKE, AND FERTILITY IN HOLSTEIN HEIFERS", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, AMERICAN DAIRY SCIENCE ASSOCIATION, SAVOY, IL, US, (200206), vol. 85, no. 6, ISSN 0022-0302, pages 1633 - 1638, XP008072978 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(02)74235-5 | [A] - OKSANEN L ET AL, "Novel polymorphism of the human ob gene promoter in lean and morbidly obese subjects.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBESITY AND RELATED METABOLIC DISORDERS : JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF OBESITY JUN 1997, (199706), vol. 21, no. 6, ISSN 0307-0565, pages 489 - 494, XP002469501 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.ijo.0800436 | [ ] - "Bos taurus gene for leptin, 5' flanking sequence and exon 1", EMBL, (20010822), Database accession no. AB070368, URL: EBI, XP002469562 [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [YP]WO2004083456 (QUANTUM GENETICS IRELAND LTD [IE], et al); | by applicant | US4394448 | US4603112 | US4722848 | EP0265785 | US4745051 | US4769330 | US4769331 | WO8810315 | WO8906700 | EP0329822 | WO9001543 | EP0370573 | US4945050 | US4965188 | WO9111525 | US5066584 | US5130238 | US5169766 | US5174993 | WO9416716 | US5338671 | US5338683 | US5348853 | US5364790 | US5374553 | US5403707 | US5405774 | US5418149 | US5446603 | US5451512 | US5455175 | US5470724 | US5487993 | US5494807 | US5505941 | US5514375 | US5523225 | US5527510 | US5545531 | US5552143 | US5567583 | US5567809 | US5576218 | US5580859 | WO9639491 | US5587287 | US5589466 | US5591639 | US5591439 | US5597910 | US5602011 | US5616301 | US5622820 | US5658764 | US5668648 | US5675700 | US5674679 | US5674738 | US5677178 | US5681741 | US5702901 | US5707804 | US5710381 | US5720923 | US5720406 | US5728528 | US5733751 | US5736106 | US5741640 | US5741676 | US5744140 | US5744141 | US5753467 | US5756285 | US5756103 | US5762938 | US5766599 | US5776686 | US5783439 | US5785926 | WO9833510 | US5795784 | US5795547 | US5807522 | US5811295 | US5817797 | US5827657 | US5837832 | US5840573 | US5853992 | US5869249 | US5869255 | US5874219 | US5882918 | US5897842 | US5935522 | US5942432 | US5958763 | US5985651 | US5989431 | US5990091 | US6001645 | US6004777 | US6015534 | US6015666 | US6033854 | US6033670 | US6036923 | US6043028 | US6045803 | US6074868 | US6074649 | US6077664 | US6090553 | US6090393 | US6103526 | US6114122 | US6124138 | US6126899 | US6130066 | US6132996 | US6153199 | US6159477 | US6168918 | US6174670 | US6174668 | US6197520 | US6200747 | US6207166 | US6207165 | US6210882 | US6218193 | US6217883 | US6221362 | US6225093 | US6224882 | US6228634 | US6228846 | US6232079 | US6238910 | US6245514 | WO0145843 | US6261431 | US6270723 | US6287766 | US6287769 | US6300124 | US6306593 | US6306400 | US6312682 | US6312683 | US6316230 | US6322980 | US6348196 | US6348450 | US6358679 | US6365418 | US6368603 | US6376473 | US6383756 | US6387621 | US6387376 | US6391314 | US6410231 | US6410229 | US6413766 | US6420114 | US6432696 | US6440668 | US6448407 | US6451770 | US6464984 | US6468742 | US6468743 | US6472156 | US6475808 | US6482615 | US6485909 | US6485729 | US6489112 | US6489159 | US6497883 | US6503710 | US6511805 | US6514700 | US6544782 | US6548256 | US6556940 | US6562298 | US6566067 | US6569672 | US6569627 | US6613560 | US6632645 | US19860920197 |