EP1788927 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING GLUCOSE LEVELS IN A BIOLOGICAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLT Acquisition Corp 30 Fairbanks, Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2010/35] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states GLUCOLIGHT CORPORATION 115 Research Drive Bethlehem, PA 18015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHURMAN, Matthew, J. 139 Hickory Road Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 02 /
SHAKESPEARE, Walter, J. 4769 Meadowview Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05767654.6 | 27.07.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005US26744 | Priority number, date | US20040916236 | 11.08.2004 Original published format: US 916236 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006020408 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1788927 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/0064 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER BLUTZUCKERSPIEGEL IN EINEM BIOLOGISCHEN GEWEBE | [2007/22] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING GLUCOSE LEVELS IN A BIOLOGICAL TISSUE | [2007/22] | French: | METHODE ET APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DES NIVEAUX DE GLUCOSE DANS UN TISSU BIOLOGIQUE | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 16.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2007 | 31.07.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - KIRILL V ET AL, "Noninvasive blood glucose monitoring with optical coherence tomography", DIABETES CARE, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, ALEXANDRIA, VA, US, (20021201), vol. 25, no. 12, ISSN 0149-5992, pages 2263 - 2267, XP002475846 [X] 1-3,5-7,12,15-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diacare.25.12.2263 | International search | [Y]US5710630 (ESSENPREIS MATTHIAS [DE], et al); | [Y]WO02065090 (INSTRUMENTATION METRICS INC [US], et al); | [X]US6725073 (MOTAMEDI MASSOUD [US], et al) |