13.09.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
29.07.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.05.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.01.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
18.01.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
18.01.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
29.06.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] |
24.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
01.12.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
28.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|