EP1763437 - FILM CONTAINING TRANSPARENT METAL OXIDE, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Polyester Film GmbH Kasteler Strasse 45 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Polyester Film GmbH Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65023 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLIESCH, Holger Karl-Liebknecht-Strasse 21 65462 Ginsheim-Gustavsburg / DE | 02 /
KUHMANN, Bodo Buchenhain 23 65594 Runkel / DE | 03 /
KIEHNE, Thorsten 51-1-202 Yawata-Higashi-Cho Nagahama, Shiga 526-0031 / JP | 04 /
HORA, Franz Königsberger Strasse 19 65830 Kriftel / DE | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2007/12] | Schweitzer, Klaus Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 05767880.7 | 15.06.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005EP06419 | Priority number, date | DE20041030455 | 24.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004030455 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006000326 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763437 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/36, C08J5/18 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B29C55/065 (EP,US);
B29C55/085 (EP,US);
B29C55/143 (EP,US);
B29C55/146 (EP,US);
B32B2305/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOLIE, ENTHALTEND TRANSPARENTES METALLOXID, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2007/12] | English: | FILM CONTAINING TRANSPARENT METAL OXIDE, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF | [2007/12] | French: | FEUILLE CONTENANT DE L'OXYDE METALLIQUE TRANSPARENT, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION DE CETTE FEUILLE | [2007/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0473809 ; | [X]JP2000284316 ; | [E]EP1568488 (MITSUBISHI POLYESTER FILM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-16 * claim 1 * * page 4, line 1 - line 5 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 16, Database accession no. 1992-128973, XP002351195 & JPH0473809 A 19920309 (HITACHI MAXELL KK) [X] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 15, Database accession no. 2001-141196, XP002351196 & JP2000284316 A 20001013 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1-16 * abstract * |