|
02.04.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.03.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.03.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2006 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
15.08.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.08.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
15.08.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
33 |
|
15.08.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
11 |