EP1774180 - RADIAL FAN WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm-papst Landshut GmbH Hofmark-Aich-Strasse 25 84030 Landshut / DE | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEBER, Roland Degernauerstr. 1a 84109 Wörth a.d. Isar / DE | 02 /
TUNGL, Rudolf Weichselgasse 10 84030 Ergolding / DE | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Sperling, Rüdiger Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Sperling, Rüdiger Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Sperling, Rüdiger Patentanwälte Staeger & Sperling Müllerstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Sperling, Rüdiger Patentanwälte Staeger & Sperling Müllerstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05768016.7 | 29.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005EP08250 | Priority number, date | DE20042012015U | 31.07.2004 Original published format: DE 202004012015 U | [2007/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006013067 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1774180 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1774180 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/28 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
F04D29/281 (EP,US);
F04D29/023 (EP,US);
F04D29/284 (EP,US);
F05D2230/53 (EP,US);
F05D2300/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | RADIALGEBLÄSERAD | [2011/32] | English: | RADIAL FAN WHEEL | [2007/16] | French: | ROUE DE SOUFFLANTE RADIALE | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/16] | RADIALGEBL[SERAD | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10157619.7 / EP2196679 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2005 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | IE | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | LU | 29.07.2012 | AT | 31.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
LU | 29.07.2012 | ||
AT | 31.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
AT | 31.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 08.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1129370 (BAHCO AB) [A] 13-25* the whole document *; | [Y]US3788765 (RUSAK V) [Y] 1,3,5,7,8,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3865506 (GERLACH C RICHARD) [Y] 1-3,5,7,8,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1416882 (HOTPOINT LTD) [A] 13-25 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2335714 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W [DE]) [A] 13-25 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO0245862 (BOSCH ROBERT CORP [US], et al) [YD] 1-3,5,7,8,11,12 * figures 1,6; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2003039548 (KIM SEONG CHUN [KR]) [Y] 1,3,5,7,8,11 * the whole document * |