EP1771934 - CONTROL OF POWER BREAKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tridonic GmbH & Co KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | [2010/38] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states TridonicAtco GmbH & Co. KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUDRELL-KOCH, Stefan Wasenstrasse 10b 6845 Hohenems / AT | 02 /
KNOEDGEN, Horst Hiltlstr. 64 80997 München / DE | [2010/33] |
Former [2007/25] | 01 /
ZUDRELL-KOCH, Stefan Wasenstrasse 10 b 6845 Hohenems / AT | ||
02 /
KNOEDGEN, Horst Hiltlstr. 64 80997 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
ZUDRELL-KOCH, Stefan Rohrmoos 60 6850 Dornbirn / AT | ||
02 /
KNOEDGEN, Horst Hiltlstr. 64 80997 München / DE | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05768655.2 | 25.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005EP08077 | Priority number, date | DE20041036958 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004036958 | [2007/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006013035 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1771934 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1771934 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/155 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H03K17/166 (EP);
H02M3/157 (EP);
H05B41/28 (EP);
H05B41/282 (EP);
Y02B20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSTEUERUNG VON LEISTUNGSSCHALTERN | [2007/15] | English: | CONTROL OF POWER BREAKERS | [2007/15] | French: | COMMANDE DE DISJONCTEURS | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10173357.4 / EP2256927 | EP18180446.9 / EP3399632 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | IE | 24.11.2010 | IT | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | LV | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | LU | 25.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
LU | 25.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
LU | 25.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4504779 (HAMAN DANIEL J [US]) [X] 6 * abstract * * figures 1,2A,2B,2C,2D,2E,2F * * column 1, lines 39-68 * * column 2, lines 42-44 * * column 4, lines 35-47 * * claims 1,6,7 * [A] 18; | [X]US4567378 (RAVER NORMAN [US]) [X] 1-6,9-13,15,17 * figures 1,2a * * column 3, lines 10-19 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 18 * * column 4, lines 42-44 *; | [X]DE19841757 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-13,15,17 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 1-17 * * column 2, lines 60-65 * * column 3, lines 19-47 *; | [X]US6194884 (KESLER SCOTT BIRK [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9-13,15,17 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 6, lines 17-39 *; | [XY]US2001048294 (BARBER JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14,16,17 * figures 7-9 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0045] - [0058] - [0071] , [0072] * [Y] 8,18-21; | [XA]DE10120789 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 6,7 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0024] * * claim 2 *[A] 18; | [X]DE10137752 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-14,17 * figures 1,2,3a,3b,3c * * paragraphs [0028] - [0035] *; | [XY]DE10163032 (TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [X] 6,17 * abstract * * figure 1 * [Y] 8,18-21; | [XA]US2003218388 (LOHMUELLER HORST [DE], et al) [X] 6,7 * abstract * * figure . * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] , [0011] * [A] 18; | [X]US2004090804 (LIPCSEI LASZLO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-13,15,17 * figure 1A * * paragraph [0020] *; | [X]US2004140833 (KIM CHAN-KYUNG [KR]) [X] 1-6,9-14,17 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0033] * |