EP1808084 - LOW-SALT SOY SAUCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIKKOMAN CORPORATION 250 Noda Noda-shi Chiba 278-8601 / JP | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAKOSHI, Jun, Kikkoman Corporation 250, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba 2788601 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Kohsuke, Kikkoman Corporation 250, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba 2788601 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Makoto, Kikkoman Corporation 250, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba 2788601 / JP | 04 /
AOTA, Hitomi, Kikkoman Corporation 250, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba 2788601 / JP | 05 /
NAKAHARA, Takeharu, Kikkoman Corporation 250, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba 2788601 / JP | 06 /
FUKUDA, Satoshi, Kikkoman Corporation 250, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba 2788601 / JP | 07 /
OGUMA, Tetsuya, Kikkoman Corporation 250, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba 2788601 / JP | 08 /
FUJII, Norikazu, Kikkoman Corporation 250, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba 2788601 / JP | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05768862.4 | 05.08.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005JP14427 | Priority number, date | JP20040275040 | 22.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004275040 | [2007/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006033205 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808084 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/238, A23L1/305 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
A23L33/185 (EP,US);
A23L27/50 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/326, A23V2250/5488 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | A23L1/238, // A23L1/305 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOJASAUCE MIT NIEDRIGEM SALZGEHALT | [2007/29] | English: | LOW-SALT SOY SAUCE | [2007/29] | French: | SAUCE DE SOJA HYPOSODIQUE | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2007 | Translation filed | 18.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 18.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/32] | 20.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4382964 (NODA FUMIO [JP], et al) [DA] 1,2 * claims 1,2,5 *; | [A]JPH07227245 (KYOTO PREF GOV, et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-8 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] *; | [Y]US5631038 (KURTZ ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 5, lines 6-9 * * claims 2,8 *; | [DA]JPH11151072 (WAKAMOTO PHARMA CO LTD, et al) [DA] 1-4 * claims 1-5 *; | [Y]JP2002325554 (KISSEI PHARMACEUTICAL, et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] * * claim 1 *; | [PA]JP2004357535 (HIGASHIMARU SHOYU CO LTD) [PA] 1,2* paragraphs [0002] - [0005] *; | [E]WO2005096841 (SYMRISE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [E] 1,2 * claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPS386582B ; | [A]JP2002325554 (KISSEI PHARMACEUTICAL, et al); | [A]JPH067111 (TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH01151072 (NEC CORP); | [AP]JP2004290129 (KIKKOMAN CORP) | Examination | US2002106424 | by applicant | JPS5668372 | JPH11151072 | JP2002325554 | US5631038 |