EP1803687 - PERFORMANCE MAINTAINING METHOD IN ELECTROLYSIS FUNCTIONAL WATER PRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIZ Co., Ltd. 16-5, Zengyo 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-087 / JP | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, Kazuyoshi, Miz Co., Ltd. 16-5, Zengyo 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2510871 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMAE, Kazuhiro, Miz Co., Ltd. 16-5, Zengyo 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2510871 / JP | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Wiebusch, Manfred Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Wiebusch, Manfred Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2007/27] | Wiebusch, Manfred Ter Meer-Müller-Steinmeister & Partner Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 05768874.9 | 08.08.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005JP14538 | Priority number, date | JP20040234529 | 11.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004234529 | JP20040381372 | 28.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004381372 | [2007/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016564 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1803687 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/461 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
C02F1/4602 (EP,US);
C02F1/46109 (EP,US);
C02F2001/425 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4612 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4617 (EP,US);
C02F2209/005 (EP,US);
C02F2209/006 (EP,US);
C02F2209/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/46] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSERHALTENDES VERFAHREN FÜR EINE FUNKTIONALE ELEKTROLYSEVORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WASSER | [2007/27] | English: | PERFORMANCE MAINTAINING METHOD IN ELECTROLYSIS FUNCTIONAL WATER PRODUCING DEVICE | [2007/27] | French: | POCEDE DE MAINTENANCE DE LA PERFORMANCE DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'EAU FONCIONNELLE PAR ELECTROLYSE | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2007 | Translation filed | 12.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/44] | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0636581 (JANIX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * figure 7 * * column 1, lines 1-17 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 17 * * claims 1-10 *; | [X]JPH11221566 (PERMELEC ELECTRODE LTD) [X] 1-10 * figure 1 * * claims 1-4 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0017] *; | [A]JP2000153277 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [X]US6251259 (SATOH FUMITAKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * figure 7 * * claims 1-10 * * column 1, lines 8-12 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 14 * * column 6, lines 9-63 *; | [AD]JP2003245669 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH11221566 (PERMELEC ELECTRODE LTD); | [A]JP2000153277 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]JP3349710B ; | [A]JP2003245669 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) | by applicant | JP3349710B | JP2003245669 | US6251259 | JPH11221556 | EP0636581 |