EP1772930 - COMPOSITE ANTENNA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKO, Motohiko, c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
IWAHASHI, Fumio, c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/22] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
SAKO, Motohiko 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | ||
02 /
Iwahashi, F. c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co. Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05768888.9 | 28.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005JP14243 | Priority number, date | JP20040221330 | 29.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004221330 | [2007/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006011659 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772930 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/28, H01Q9/36 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
H01Q9/36 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | H01Q21/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/20] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTE ANTENNEN-EINRICHTUNG | [2007/15] | English: | COMPOSITE ANTENNA DEVICE | [2007/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE COMPOSITE | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | Translation filed | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 24.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4540988 (MUNK BENEDIKT A [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 33 ** column 4, lines 21-26 *; | [X]US4814777 (MONSER GEORGE J [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 39 - column 6, paragraph 61 *; | [I]US5581264 (TABATA KOUJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * column 5, lines 26-40 * * column 6, lines 15-29 *; | [X]US5760747 (MCCOY DANNY O [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 6 * | International search | [A]JP2001251117 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2004023369 (TOSHIBA CORP) |