EP1774681 - WIRELESS TRANSMIT UNIT FOR ENHANCED UPLINK MULTIPLEXING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/16] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCED UPLINK MULTIPLEXING | ||
[2009/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRY, Stephen, E. 15 Summit Avenue Northport, New York 11768 / US | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Hjalmarsson, Magnus Axel Awapatent AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Hjalmarsson, Magnus Axel Awapatent AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 05769254.3 | 05.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005US23891 | Priority number, date | US20040588960P | 19.07.2004 Original published format: US 588960 P | US20050113763 | 25.04.2005 Original published format: US 113763 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006019562 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1774681 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1774681 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/02, H04J3/22, H04J3/16, H04B7/00 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H04W28/24 (EP,NO,US);
H04W28/0221 (NO,US);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04B7/2612 (KR);
H04L5/023 (KR);
H04W28/0268 (NO,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE ÜBERTRAGUNGSEINHEIT ZUM ERWEITERUNGS-AUFWÄRTSSTRECKEN-MULTIPLEXEN | [2009/25] | English: | WIRELESS TRANSMIT UNIT FOR ENHANCED UPLINK MULTIPLEXING | [2009/25] | French: | UNITE DE TRANSMISSION SANS FIL POUR LE MULTIPLEXAGE EN LIAISON MONTANTE AMELIORE | [2009/25] |
Former [2007/16] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERWEITERUNGS-AUFWÄRTSSTRECKEN-MULTIPLEXEN | ||
Former [2007/16] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCED UPLINK MULTIPLEXING | ||
Former [2007/16] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MULTIPLEXAGE EN LIAISON MONTANTE AMELIORE | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09175669.2 / EP2148458 | EP10179333.9 / EP2259460 | EP15180482.0 / EP2978257 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | BE | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | LT | 25.11.2009 | LV | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | IS | 25.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | LU | 05.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
LU | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | LT | 25.11.2009 | |
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 25.11.2009 | |
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0993148 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,32 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] ** paragraph [0051] *; | [PX] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS)", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200503), vol. 3-R2, no. V640, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014027656 [PX] 1-60 * paragraph [4.2.3.2] * * paragraph [4.2.3.4] * * paragraph [4.2.4.2] * | International search | [A]US2003036403 (SHIU DA-SHAN [US], et al); | [AP]US2004228315 (MALKAMAKI ESA [FI]); | [AP]US2005053035 (KWAK YONG-JUN [KR], et al); | [AP]US2005073985 (HEO YOUN-HYOUNG [KR], et al); | [AP]WO2005048491 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) |