EP1899220 - HIGH-SECURITY AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nimbus S.R.L. Via Volpiano 55 10040 Lombardore TO / IT | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPUANI, Alfredo Via Rosta 10 I-10143 Torino / IT | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Spandonari, Carlo Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l. Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Spandonari, Carlo Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l. corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05769453.1 | 07.07.2005 | [2008/12] | WO2005IT00387 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007353 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1899220 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1899220 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64B1/02, B64C31/032 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B64C31/032 (EP,US);
B64B1/02 (EP,US);
B64B2201/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHSICHERHEITSFLUGZEUG | [2008/12] | English: | HIGH-SECURITY AIRCRAFT | [2008/12] | French: | AERONEF A HAUTE SECURITE | [2010/48] |
Former [2008/12] | AÉRONEF À HAUTE SÉCURITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2005 | Translation filed | 27.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 07.02.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | LV | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | IE | 07.07.2011 | LU | 07.07.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | BE | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 07.07.2011 | ||
LU | 07.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | BE | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 07.07.2011 | ||
LU | 07.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 07.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | BE | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | BE | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
PT | 16.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3151825 (KINDLING PAUL K) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US4158448 (MOCHIZUKI MATSUJI) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]DE2840466 (KAUP UDO) [Y] 1-10,15-17 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2669602 (R P DEV SARL [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0768238 (HIROSE TOKUZO [JP]) [Y] 1-10,15-17 * abstract *; | [A]DE19924467 (UTI HOLDING & MAN AG [DE]) [A] 6-9 * column 5, line 48 - line 52; figure 2 * |