EP1791765 - LID, IN PARTICULAR FOR FOOD PACKAGING, OR LABEL, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE NECK OF A BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Constantia Hueck Folien GmbH & Co. KG Pirkmühle 14-16 92712 Pirk / DE | [2009/16] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states Hueck Folien GmbH & Co. KG Pirkmühle 12 92712 Pirk / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, Konstantin Infanteriestrasse 11 92637 Weiden / DE | 02 /
HAASE, Heinrich Braunmühlstrasse 9 92637 Weiden / DE | 03 /
EGER, Andreas Egelseestrasse 23 92648 Vohenstrauss / DE | 04 /
TRÄGER, Manfred Kirchäckerstrasse 17 92637 Weiden / DE | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Schneck, Herbert Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05769766.6 | 02.08.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005EP08330 | Priority number, date | DE20041040347 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004040347 | DE20052006038U | 14.04.2005 Original published format: DE 202005006038 U | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006021291 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791765 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791765 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/20, G09F3/02 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
G09F3/04 (EP,US);
B65D77/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DECKEL, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNG, ODER ETIKETT, INSBESONDERE FLASCHENHALSETIKETT | [2007/23] | English: | LID, IN PARTICULAR FOR FOOD PACKAGING, OR LABEL, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE NECK OF A BOTTLE | [2007/23] | French: | COUVERCLE, NOTAMMENT POUR UN EMBALLAGE ALIMENTAIRE, OU ETIQUETTE, NOTAMMENT POUR UN COL DE BOUTEILLE | [2010/01] |
Former [2007/23] | COUVERCLE, NOTAMMENT POUR UN EMBALLAGE ALIMENTAIRE, OU TIQUETTE, NOTAMMENT POUR UN COL DE BOUTEILLE | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | IE | 12.05.2010 | IT | 12.05.2010 | LT | 12.05.2010 | LV | 12.05.2010 | NL | 12.05.2010 | RO | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | SI | 12.05.2010 | SK | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | LU | 02.08.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | ES | 23.08.2010 | BE | 31.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | IS | 12.09.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | HU | 13.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 12.05.2010 | |
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
LU | 02.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 12.05.2010 | |
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
LU | 02.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 12.05.2010 | |
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 12.05.2010 | |
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | CY | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CY | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 12.05.2010 | |
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 12.05.2010 | |
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 12.05.2010 | |
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 12.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE2246226 (PFEIFFER OHLER EISEN THEOB) [X] 1,2,4,6-9 * page 6, line 1 - line 6; figure 2 * * page 6, paragraph L * [Y] 5 [I] 10-15; | [Y]US4708247 (LIEBEL HENRY L [US]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 61 - column 2, line 11 ** column 4, line 50 - line 53; figure 5 * |