EP1778660 - PROCESS FOR THE SEPARATION OF PACLITAXEL AND CEPHALOMANNIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IVAX Pharmaceuticals s.r.o. Ostravska 29 747 70 Opava 9 / CZ | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHTA, Martin Stolarska 4 Ludgerovice 747 14 / CZ | 02 /
CVAK, Ladislav 6, kvetna 6A 746 01 Opava - Zlatniky / CZ | 03 /
SOBOTIK, Roman Karafiatova 8 Opava 7, 747 07 / CZ | 04 /
STVERKA, Pavel Sandova 268 Velka Polom 747 64 / CZ | [2007/34] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
BUCHTA, Martin Stolarska 4 Ludgerovice 747 14 / CZ | ||
02 /
CVAK, Ladislav Solna 19 746 01 Opava / CZ | |||
03 /
SOBOTIK, Roman Karafiatova 8 Opava 7, 747 07 / CZ | |||
04 /
STVERKA, Pavel Sandova 268 Velka Polom 747 64 / CZ | |||
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
BUCHTA, Martin Stolarska 4 Ludgerovice 747 14 / CZ | ||
02 /
CVAK, Ladislav Solna 19 Opava 746 01 / CZ | |||
03 /
SOBOTIK, Roman Karafiatova 8 Opava 7, 747 07 / CZ | |||
04 /
STVERKA, Pavel Sandova 268 Velka Polom 747 64 / CZ | Representative(s) | Gallagher, Kirk James D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Gallagher, Kirk James D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05770208.6 | 01.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005US23483 | Priority number, date | US20040585402P | 02.07.2004 Original published format: US 585402 P | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006014345 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1778660 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778660 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D305/14 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
C07D305/14 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON PACLITAXEL UND CEPHALOMANNIN | [2007/18] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SEPARATION OF PACLITAXEL AND CEPHALOMANNIN | [2007/18] | French: | PROCESSUS DE SÉPARATION DE PACLITAXEL ET DE CÉPHALOMANNINE | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 08.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2009 | BE | 28.01.2009 | CY | 28.01.2009 | DK | 28.01.2009 | EE | 28.01.2009 | FI | 28.01.2009 | LT | 28.01.2009 | LV | 28.01.2009 | NL | 28.01.2009 | SI | 28.01.2009 | SK | 28.01.2009 | TR | 28.01.2009 | BG | 28.04.2009 | SE | 28.04.2009 | GR | 29.04.2009 | GB | 01.07.2009 | IE | 01.07.2009 | LU | 01.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/22] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
LT | 28.01.2009 | ||
LV | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SI | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
BG | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LU | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
LT | 28.01.2009 | ||
LV | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SI | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
BG | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
LT | 28.01.2009 | ||
LV | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SI | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
BG | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
LT | 28.01.2009 | ||
LV | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SI | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
BG | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
LT | 28.01.2009 | ||
LV | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SI | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
BG | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
LT | 28.01.2009 | ||
LV | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SI | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
BG | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
BE | 28.01.2009 | ||
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
LT | 28.01.2009 | ||
LV | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SI | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US6333419 (GABETTA BRUNO [IT], et al) [AD] 1-16* claim 1 *; | [A]WO0238556 (ACTIPHARM INC [CA]) [A] 1-16 * page 14, line 19 - page 15, line 18; page 18, line 25 - page 19, line 2 * |