EP1791167 - SUBSTRATE PROCESSING APPARATUS, USE STATE ASCERTAINING METHOD, AND FALSE USE PREVENTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | For all designated states Nikon Systems Inc. 3-3, Minatomirai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2206116 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nikon Systems Inc. 3-3, Minatomirai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2206116 / JP | |||
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nikon Systems Inc. 3-3, Minatomirai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2206116 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Hiroyuki, C/O NIKON CORPORATION Intell. Property Dept., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008331 / JP | 02 /
OKITA, Shinichi, C/O NIKON CORPORATION Intell. Property Dept., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008331 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGUCHI, Tadashi, C/O NIKON CORPORATION Intell. Property Dept., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008331 / JP | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Wiebusch, Manfred Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Wiebusch, Manfred Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2007/22] | Wiebusch, Manfred TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 05770468.6 | 10.08.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005JP14685 | Priority number, date | JP20040235216 | 12.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004235216 | [2007/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016619 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791167 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027, G06F21/00 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70425 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70508 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70533 (KR);
G06F21/71 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67253 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67294 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2221/2105 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2221/2113 (US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2221/2149 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/22] | H01L21/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTRATVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BENUTZUNGSZUSTANDS-BESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND FALSCHBENUTZUNGS-VERHINDERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/22] | English: | SUBSTRATE PROCESSING APPARATUS, USE STATE ASCERTAINING METHOD, AND FALSE USE PREVENTING METHOD | [2007/22] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTRAT, PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION D'UTILISATION, ET PROCEDE DE PREVENTION DE MAUVAISE UTILISATION | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2007 | Translation filed | 12.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 20.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 10.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | EP13185393.9 / EP2688090 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5406261 (GLENN JAMES T [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * columns 2-6 * * figures 1-9b *; | [X]US6618810 (DIRIE HERZI [US]) [X] 1,2,17,18,22,24 * abstract * * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 20 * * column 5, line 38 - column 8 ** figures 1-4 *; | [XY]EP1378810 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,17,18,22,24 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] - [0 45] , [0049] , [0050] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3 | International search | [A]JPH11161486 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP); | [Y]JP2001265581 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2001282526 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2002091922 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [A]JP2002189590 (UENO HIROYUKI); | [Y]JP2002251225 (AMBITION INC); | [Y]JP2004038247 (FUJITSU FIP CORP) | by applicant | US5406261 | US6618810 | EP1378810 |