EP1787998 - ANTIBODY AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | |||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHI, Minako, MITSUBISHI KAGAKU INSTITUTE OF LIFE SCIENCES 11, Minamiooya Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8511 / JP | 02 /
NAITO, Koji, MITSUBISHI PHARMA CORPORATION, Tokyo Office 2-6, Nihonbashi-honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 1038405 / JP | 03 /
IDENO, Shouji, MITSUBISHI PHARMA CORPORATION, Tokyo Office 2-6, Nihonbashi-honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 1038405 / JP | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05770817.4 | 11.08.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005JP14735 | Priority number, date | JP20040234857 | 11.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004234857 | [2007/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016644 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787998 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, A61K39/395, A61P25/28, A61P43/00, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/53 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2007/21] | English: | ANTIBODY AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME | [2007/21] | French: | ANTICORPS ET UTILISATION S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2007/21] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2007 | Translation filed | 23.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0072880 (NEURALAB LTD [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-19*p.3, l.4-6" *; | [X]WO2004024090 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-19 *p.13, l.13-22* *p. 39, l.30-32* *p.44, l.5-19* * figure 3 *; | [X]WO2004031400 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-19 *p.3, l.20-21* *p.6, l.30-31* *p.11, l.11-12* *p.23, l.12-14* *p.63, l.20-21* *p.84, l.19-33* *p.91, l.20-26* *p.94, l.20-p.95, l.2*; | [X]DE10303974 (ABBOTT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-10,13-19 * page 7, paragraph 55 - paragraph 56 * | International search | [X]JP2003509020 ; | [X]JP2003517461 ; | [X]JP2001247600 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [X]JP2002105099 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [X] - LOMBARDO J.A. ET AL, "Amyloid-beta antibody treatment leads to rapid normalization of plaque-induced neuritic alterations", J. NEUROSCI., (2003), vol. 23, no. 34, pages 10879 - 10883, XP002999354 | [X] - HOSHI M., "'Katachi' ga Seigyo suru Shinkei no Shi", PROTEIN, NUCLEIC ACID AND ENZYME, 2004 NEN, 5 GATSU, (2004), vol. 49, no. 7, pages 1098 - 1100, XP002999355 | [Y] - HOSHI M. ET AL, "Spherical aggregates of beta-amyloid (amylospheroid) show high neurotoxicity and activate tau protein kinase I/glycogen synthase kinase-3beta", PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, no. 11, pages 6370 - 6375, XP002999356 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1237107100 | [Y] - HOSHI M., "beta-amyloid Jiko Soshikika ni yoru Shinkei Dokusei no Hatsugen", CHEMISTRY & CHEMICAL INDUSTRY, 2004 NEN, 5 GATSU,, (2004), vol. 57, no. 5, pages 519 - 521, XP002999357 | by applicant | - DESHPANDE A ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2006), vol. 45, no. 51 |