EP1915887 - BATTERY COMPARTMENT DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH Gebbertstrasse 125 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Beng Hai Blk 702, Hougang Ave 2 03-51 Singapore 530702 / SG | 02 /
HO, Wai Kit 9 Jalan Rajawali 04-04 Singapore 598431 / SG | 03 /
KOO, Wee Haw Blk 516, Jurong West St. 52 06-55 Singapore 640516 / SG | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05771629.2 | 20.08.2005 | [2008/18] | WO2005SG00285 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007024194 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915887 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1915887 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H01M2/10 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
H04R25/602 (EP,US);
H01M50/216 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEFACH-KLAPPE | [2008/18] | English: | BATTERY COMPARTMENT DOOR | [2008/18] | French: | PORTE DE COMPARTIMENT A PILES | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2010 | BE | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | HU | 29.09.2010 | IT | 29.09.2010 | LT | 29.09.2010 | LV | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | PL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | ES | 09.01.2011 | IS | 29.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
LT | 29.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH03141551 ; | [A]JPH08185843 ; | [A]US4598177 (MCGROARTY JOSEPH F [US], et al) [A] 3,4,13,14 * abstract *; | [A]EP0684749 (COSELGI SPA [IT]) [A] 7,8,16,17 * abstract * * column 5, line 47 - column 7, line 22; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US6144749 (FIDELER BRIAN [US]) [A] 2,6,12,19 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - line 47; figure 4; claim 6 *; | [A]EP1435758 (PHONAK AG [CH]) [A] 1,5,9,10,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0024]; figure 3 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910911), vol. 015, no. 359, Database accession no. (E - 1110), & JP03141551 A 19910617 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,9-11,16-18 * abstract * [A] 5,15 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08185843 A 19960716 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10,12,15,19 * abstract * |