24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
30.09.2016 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
19.06.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
19.06.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
10.12.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
26.11.2015 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
05.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
27.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
29.06.2012 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
23.04.2012 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
19.12.2011 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
18.11.2011 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
28.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
09.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
12.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
14.01.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
14.01.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
10.01.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.11.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.10.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
06.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.09.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
09.07.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.11.2007 |
First examination report |
|
22.11.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.10.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
24.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
06.04.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
13.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|