EP1782108 - A METHOD OF CREATING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE, A DIFFRACTIVE ELEMENT AND METHOD OF CREATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optaglio sro 250 68 Husinec-Rez 199 / CZ | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryzi, Zbynek c/o Optaglio sro 250 68 Husinec-Rez 199 / CZ | 02 /
Kolarik, Vladimir c/o Optaglio sro 250 68 Husinec-Rez 199 / CZ | 03 /
Kotacka, Libor c/o Optaglio sro 250 68 Husinec-Rez 199 / CZ | 04 /
Zolotukhin, Max c/o Optaglio Ltd, Meridian House, Greenwich Way Andover Hampshire SP10 4DU / GB | [2011/07] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
RYZI, Zbynek c/o Optaglio sro 250 68 Husinec-Rez 199 / CZ | ||
02 /
KOLARIK, Vladimir c/o Optaglio sro 250 68 Husinec-Rez 199 / CZ | |||
03 /
KOTACKA, Libor c/o Optaglio sro 250 68 Husinec-Rez 199 / CZ | |||
04 /
Zolotukhin, Max c/o Optaglio Ltd, Meridian House, Greenwich Way Andover Hampshire SP10 4DU / GB | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Gill, David Alan W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05771928.8 | 08.08.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005EP53903 | Priority number, date | CZ20040000869 | 06.08.2004 Original published format: CZ 20040869 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006013215 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782108 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1782108 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18, B42D15/10 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
G02B5/1842 (EP,US);
B42D25/324 (US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
G02B30/50 (EP,US);
G02B5/18 (US);
G03H1/0011 (EP,US);
G03H1/30 (EP,US);
B42D2035/16 (EP);
G03H1/0244 (EP,US);
G03H1/2249 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0497 (EP,US);
G03H2210/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN BILDES, BEUGUNGSELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER ERZEUGUNG | [2007/19] | English: | A METHOD OF CREATING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE, A DIFFRACTIVE ELEMENT AND METHOD OF CREATING THE SAME | [2007/19] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE A CREER UNE IMAGE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE, ELEMENT A DIFFRACTION ET PROCEDE DE CREATION CORRESPONDANT | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.2011
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.2011
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | 23.12.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.06.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.05.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/44] | 20.06.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.02.2011 | CY | 16.02.2011 | DK | 16.02.2011 | EE | 16.02.2011 | IS | 16.02.2011 | LI | 16.02.2011 | LT | 16.02.2011 | LV | 16.02.2011 | SE | 16.02.2011 | SI | 16.02.2011 | GR | 17.05.2011 | PT | 16.06.2011 | IE | 08.08.2011 | LU | 08.08.2011 | AT | 08.08.2014 | CZ | 08.08.2014 | FI | 08.08.2014 | PL | 08.08.2014 | RO | 08.08.2014 | SK | 08.08.2014 | TR | 08.08.2014 | ES | 09.08.2014 | HU | 09.08.2014 | BE | 31.08.2014 | BG | 31.08.2014 | MC | 01.09.2014 | NL | 01.03.2015 | IT | 08.08.2015 | [2022/30] |
Former [2017/07] | CH | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
AT | 08.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2014 | ||
FI | 08.08.2014 | ||
PL | 08.08.2014 | ||
RO | 08.08.2014 | ||
SK | 08.08.2014 | ||
ES | 09.08.2014 | ||
HU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 31.08.2014 | ||
MC | 01.09.2014 | ||
NL | 01.03.2015 | ||
IT | 08.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
AT | 08.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2014 | ||
FI | 08.08.2014 | ||
PL | 08.08.2014 | ||
RO | 08.08.2014 | ||
SK | 08.08.2014 | ||
ES | 09.08.2014 | ||
HU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 31.08.2014 | ||
MC | 01.09.2014 | ||
NL | 01.03.2015 | ||
IT | 08.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
AT | 08.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2014 | ||
FI | 08.08.2014 | ||
PL | 08.08.2014 | ||
RO | 08.08.2014 | ||
SK | 08.08.2014 | ||
ES | 09.08.2014 | ||
HU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
MC | 01.09.2014 | ||
NL | 01.03.2015 | ||
IT | 08.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
AT | 08.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2014 | ||
FI | 08.08.2014 | ||
PL | 08.08.2014 | ||
RO | 08.08.2014 | ||
SK | 08.08.2014 | ||
ES | 09.08.2014 | ||
HU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
MC | 01.09.2014 | ||
NL | 01.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
AT | 08.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2014 | ||
FI | 08.08.2014 | ||
RO | 08.08.2014 | ||
SK | 08.08.2014 | ||
HU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
MC | 01.09.2014 | ||
NL | 01.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2014 | ||
FI | 08.08.2014 | ||
RO | 08.08.2014 | ||
SK | 08.08.2014 | ||
HU | 09.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
MC | 01.09.2014 | ||
NL | 01.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
RO | 08.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
MC | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
MC | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
MC | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.02.2011 | |
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4455061 (CASE STEVEN K [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US4547037 (CASE STEVEN K [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XD]WO9008338 (OHALA JOHN J [US]) [XD] 1 * page 5, line 3 - line 6; claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO9502200 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5909313 (LEE ROBERT ARTHUR [AU]) [A] 1,22,23,33,52 * abstract *; | [A]WO0184193 (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US]) [A] 1,22,23,33,52 * abstract * |