EP1766203 - EXHAUST GAS CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashizume, Takeshi c/o Toyota Jidosha KK, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Gotou, Isamu c/o Toyota Jidosha KK, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Tominaga, Hiroyuki c/o Toyota Jidosha KK, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05772007.0 | 07.07.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005IB01927 | Priority number, date | JP20040203175 | 09.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004203175 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006008599 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1766203 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1766203 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/023, F01N3/035 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
F01N13/009 (EP);
F01N13/0093 (EP);
F01N3/035 (EP);
F02D41/0007 (EP);
F02D41/029 (EP);
F02B37/00 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/42] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2007/48] | English: | EXHAUST GAS CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2007/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE REGULATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2007/13] |
Former [2007/13] | ABGASENTGIFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | [2010/25] |
Former [2010/24] | FR | 31.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003200745 (VAN NIEUWSTADT MICHIEL J [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] * * figure 1 *; | [YA]JPH0693827 ; | [A]DE10354276 (MITSUBISHI FUSO TRUCK & BUS [JP]) [A] 1,3 * paragraphs [0013] , [0022] , [0024] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2003167756 (SZYMKOWICZ PATRICK G [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] * * figure 1 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940707), vol. 018, no. 360, Database accession no. (M - 1634), & JP06093827 A 19940405 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3 |