EP1784324 - OPTOELECTRONIC SENSOR DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHWIN, Matthias Am Knappenberg 43 44139 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
WEBER, Thomas Schulstr. 70 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Kerkmann, Detlef Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co.KG Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Kerkmann, Detlef Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co.KG, Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 05772113.6 | 09.07.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005EP07471 | Priority number, date | DE20041033734 | 13.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004033734 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006005558 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1784324 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1784324 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08, G01N21/45 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G01N21/552 (EP,US);
B60S1/0822 (EP,US);
B60S1/0833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHE SENSOREINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2007/20] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC SENSOR DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/20] | French: | SYSTEME DE CAPTEUR OPTOELECTRONIQUE DESTINE A UN VEHICULE | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 27.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IE | 16.04.2008 | LT | 16.04.2008 | LV | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | PL | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | AT | 09.07.2008 | LU | 09.07.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | IS | 16.08.2008 | PT | 17.09.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
AT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LU | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
AT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LU | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/52] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
AT | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 16.04.2008 | |
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4701613 (WATANABE TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4-6,12 * column 3, lines 29-66; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19701258 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 7 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE19720874 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,7,9 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 41; figure - *; | [A]DE19830120 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 7,8 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 42; figure - *; | [A]WO0206095 (GATES CORP [US]) [A] 9* page 8, lines 14-22; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1431142 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,4-7,9,12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0037]; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | DE19720874 |