EP1771530 - ANTI-OXIDANT MACROMONOMERS AND POLYMERS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polnox Corporation 4 Cambridge Center, 2nd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOLLI, Ashok, L. 6 Rosemary Lane Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05772822.2 | 19.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005US25513 | Priority number, date | US20040590575P | 23.07.2004 Original published format: US 590575 P | US20040590646P | 23.07.2004 Original published format: US 590646 P | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006014605 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1771530 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1771530 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09K15/08, C08G61/02, C07C37/00 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
C09K15/08 (EP,US);
C07C37/002 (EP,US);
C07C45/46 (EP,US);
C07C49/83 (EP,US);
C08F112/24 (EP,US);
C08F12/24 (US);
C08G61/02 (EP,US);
C08G61/025 (EP,US);
C08G61/10 (EP,US);
C09K15/12 (EP,US);
C09K15/20 (EP,US);
C09K15/28 (EP,US);
C12P13/02 (EP,US);
C12P7/22 (EP,US);
C12P7/26 (EP,US);
C12P7/62 (EP,US);
C08G2261/1422 (EP,US);
C08G2261/1424 (EP,US);
C08G2261/1426 (EP,US);
C08G2261/148 (EP,US);
C08G2261/312 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C37/002, C07C39/16 (US,EP);
C07C45/46, C07C49/83 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIOXIDATIVE MAKROMONOMERE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2007/15] | English: | ANTI-OXIDANT MACROMONOMERS AND POLYMERS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2007/15] | French: | MACROMONOMERES ET POLYMERES ANTIOXYDANTS ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 24.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2009 | BE | 09.09.2009 | BG | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | IT | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | PL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | ES | 20.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | FI | 09.09.2009 | |
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59197447 ; | [A]US3294836 (PETERSON JANET B, et al) [A] 1,15 * claim 1 *; | [X]GB1283103 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,8-12,14-16,20-23,41,55,56 * claims 1,2,7 *; | [A]NL7905000 (CINCINNATI MILACRON CHEM) [A] 1,15 * claims 1,20 * * see chemical formulas 29, 51, 52, 57 and 58. *; | [A]US4267358 (HECHENBLEIKNER INGENUIN, et al) [A] 1,15 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4281192 (JACQUET BERNARD, et al) [A] 1,15 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4355148 (LAYER ROBERT W, et al) [A] 1,15 * claim - *; | [A]EP0404039 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,15 * claim 1 * * page 10 - page 15; table - *; | [X]WO03087260 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS LOWELL [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-4 * * page 16, paragraph 5 - page 18, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 3 *; | [X]WO2004050795 (UNIV TUFTS [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 1,4-6,11,12 * * page 21, line 24 - page 23, line 30 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850315), vol. 009, no. 059, Database accession no. (C - 270), & JP59197447 A 19841109 (MITSUI SEKIYU KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1,15 * abstract * | [DA] - KHAN K M ET AL, "An expedient esterification of aromatic carboxylic acids using sodium bromate and sodium hydrogen sulfite", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030714), vol. 59, no. 29, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 5549 - 5554, XP004437422 [DA] 1,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(03)00812-3 |