EP1779375 - METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR ALTERING THE REVERBERATION TIME OF A ROOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Larsen, Niels Werner Ny Carlsbergvej 27, 4.th 1760 Ko̸benhavn V / DK | [2012/50] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Larsen, Niels Werner Ny Carlsbergvej 27, 4.th 1760 Ko̸benhavn V / DK | ||
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Larsen, Niels Werner Dannevirkegade 3 1. tv. 1763 Copenhagen V / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/07] |
Former [2012/04] | Olsen, Henrik Bagger, et al Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | ||
Former [2011/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2010/31] | Sigh, Erik, et al Plougmann & Vingtoft a/s Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | ||
Former [2010/24] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/18] | Tonnesen, Bo, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S Vester Soegade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 05773193.7 | 02.08.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005IB52580 | Priority number, date | DK20040001199 | 06.08.2004 Original published format: DK 200401199 | WO2005DK00322 | 13.05.2005 Original published format: PCT/DK2005/000322 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006016321 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1779375 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1779375 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/16 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
G10K11/172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR VERÄNDERUNG DER WIDERHALLZEIT EINES RAUMS | [2012/24] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR ALTERING THE REVERBERATION TIME OF A ROOM | [2007/18] | French: | PROCEDE, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE MODIFIER LE TEMPS DE REVERBERATION D'UNE PIECE | [2007/18] |
Former [2007/18] | VERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR VERÄNDERUNG DER HALLZEIT EINES RAUMS | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MC | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | LU | 02.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/20] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2615549 (CAIRE CLAUDE CONST METALLIQ CA [FR]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5299522 (DIXON JR HENRY R [US]) [A] 1-29 * column 1, line 40 - line 53 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6332027 (GUILLOUD JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [X] 1-29 * column 1, line 36 - line 59 * * column 3, line 45 - line 47; figure 1 * * column 4, line 17 - line 25 * * column 4, line 45 - line 67 * * column 5, line 1 - line 6 * * column 5, line 23 - line 25 * * column 6, line 8 - line 32 * * figures 4,5,7,9 *; | [A]EP1353025 (MORRIS BENEDICT GEORGE [GB]) [A] 1-29 * column 1, paragraph 3 ** column 2, paragraph 9 *; | [A]WO2004106663 (ART ANDERSEN AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-29 * page 8 * * pages 12,13 * * figures 1,2 * |