EP1772024 - DSX MODULE WITH PERFORMANCE MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADC Telecommunications, Inc. 13625 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344-2252 / US | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZALEZ BLAZQUEZ, Jose, Luis Mariano Jose De Larra, 60 Alcala de Henares 28806 Madrid / ES | 02 /
LOUWAGIE, Dominic, J. 15980 North Hillcrest Court Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | 03 /
DEWEY, James, D. 5025 Norwood Lane Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | 04 /
BAKER, Scott, K. 7109 Oliver Avenue South Richfield, MN 55423 / US | 05 /
SAND, Duane, R. 9724 State HWY 24 NW Annandale, MN 55302 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
GONZALEZ BLAZQUEZ, Jose, Luis 28806 Alcala De Henares Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
LOUWAGIE, Dominic, J. 15980 North Hillcrest Court Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | |||
03 /
DEWEY, James, D. 5025 Norwood Lane Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | |||
04 /
BAKER, Scott, K. 7109 Oliver Avenue South Richfield, MN 55423 / US | |||
05 /
SAND, Duane, R. 9724 State HWY 24 NW Annandale, MN 55302 / US | |||
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
GONZALEZ BLAZQUEZ, Jose, Luis 28806 Alcala De Henares Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
LOUWAGIE, Dominic, J. 15980 North Hillcrest Court Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | |||
03 /
DEWEY, James, D. 5025 Norwood Lane Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | |||
04 /
BAKER, Scott, K. 7109 Oliver Avenue South Richfield, MN 55423 / US | |||
05 /
SAND, Duane, R. 8312 Emerson Avenue N. Brooklyn Park, MN 55444 / US | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05773488.1 | 18.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005US25374 | Priority number, date | US20040895246 | 19.07.2004 Original published format: US 895246 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006020183 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772024 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/14 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H04Q1/142 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/10 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/12 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DSX-MODUL MIT LEISTUNGSÜBERWACHUNG | [2007/15] | English: | DSX MODULE WITH PERFORMANCE MONITORING | [2007/15] | French: | MODULE DSX AVEC SUIVI DE PERFORMANCE | [2013/49] |
Former [2007/15] | MODULE DE REPARTITEUR A COMMANDE NUMERIQUE AVEC SUIVI DE PERFORMANCE | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 10.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003022543 (OGREN BRUCE C [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * abstract ** paragraphs [0009] , [0035] - [0040] * |