EP1743440 - INTERRUPTING USE OF FREQUENCY LAYER CONVERGENCE SCHEME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | [2009/41] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Myeong-Cheol 11, rue Jules Ferry F-95880 Enghien-les-Bains / FR | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05774223.1 | 05.08.2005 | [2007/03] | WO2005KR02564 | Priority number, date | US20040599590P | 05.08.2004 Original published format: US 599590 P | US20040600244P | 09.08.2004 Original published format: US 600244 P | US20040601267P | 12.08.2004 Original published format: US 601267 P | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006014092 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1743440 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1743440 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/08 (KR);
H04W84/042 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/03] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERBRECHUNG DER BENUTZUNG DES FREQUENZSCHICHTKONVERGENZVERFAHRENS | [2007/03] | English: | INTERRUPTING USE OF FREQUENCY LAYER CONVERGENCE SCHEME | [2007/03] | French: | INTERRUPTION DE L'UTILISATION D'UN SYSTEME DE CONVERGENCE DE COUCHES DE FREQUENCE | [2007/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2009 | BE | 07.10.2009 | CY | 07.10.2009 | CZ | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | EE | 07.10.2009 | IT | 07.10.2009 | LT | 07.10.2009 | LV | 07.10.2009 | PL | 07.10.2009 | RO | 07.10.2009 | SI | 07.10.2009 | SK | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | BG | 07.01.2010 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | IS | 07.02.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | HU | 08.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | LT | 07.10.2009 | |
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | LT | 07.10.2009 | |
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 07.10.2009 | |
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | SI | 07.10.2009 | |
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/14] | SI | 07.10.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002111166 (MONROE ROBERT L [US]) [Y] 1,3-8,16-19,21-26,34-36 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0018] , [0043] , [0044] , [0048] , [0054] *; | [Y]US6449491 (DAILEY TIMOTHY E [US]) [Y] 1,3-8,16-19,21-26,34-36 * column 3, lines 40-66 *; | [A] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS)", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200406), vol. 3-R, no. V610, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014016838 [A] 1-36 * paragraph [11.2] * | International search | [A]US6163694 (LIND TORSTEN [SE], et al); | [A]US2001036827 (EDLUND PETER HANS [SE], et al); | [A]US6463054 (MAZUR SARA [SE], et al) |